EP3432123 - VARIABLE CAPACITANCE PRESSURE SENSOR AND TRUE WRITING STYLUS PEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangxi Huachuang Touch Control Technology Co., Ltd. Wan'an Industrial Park Phase ll Ji'an City Jiangxi Province, 343899 / CN | [2021/31] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Guangdong Zonghua Touch Control Technology Co. Ltd. No.49 Development Building International Financial Innovation Center No.2 Ten Road of Science and Technology Songshan Lake High-Tech, Industrial Development Zone Dongguan, Guangdong 523000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XI, Bangzi C East 1 No. 23 the 3Rd Industrial Park of Xia Village Gongming Street Guangming District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Dezhong C East 1 No.23 the 3Rd Industrial Park of Xia Village Gongming Street Guangming District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | London IP Ltd 100 High street Milford on Sea Lymington, Hampshire SO41 0QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | London IP Ltd Lymington Business Centre Solent House Cannon Street Lymington, Hampshire SO41 9BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 16894210.0 | 28.11.2016 | [2019/04] | WO2016CN107424 | Priority number, date | CN201610147520 | 15.03.2016 Original published format: CN201610147520 | [2019/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017157051 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432123 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0354, G06F3/044, G06F3/038, G06F3/042, G06F3/046 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G06F3/04162 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/044 (CN,KR);
G06F3/03545 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/017 (KR,US);
G06F3/0383 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0414 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | G06F3/0354, G06F3/044 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | DRUCKSENSOR MIT VARIABLER KAPAZITÄT UND ECHTER SCHREIBSTIFT | [2019/04] | English: | VARIABLE CAPACITANCE PRESSURE SENSOR AND TRUE WRITING STYLUS PEN | [2019/04] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION À CAPACITÉ VARIABLE ET STYLET D'ÉCRITURE VRAIE | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2017 | Translation filed | 25.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2017 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 24.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 09.12.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 08.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/33] | 11.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2020 | 30.11.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US8878823 (KREMIN VIKTOR [UA], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, lines 16-42 * * column 12, line 34 - column 13, line 5 ** figure 5 *; | [Y]US2015317001 (BEN-BASSAT DAN [IL], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0083] * |