EP3429758 - SYSTEM FOR DISPENSING MULTIPLE COMPONENT CHEMICAL SPRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akurate Dynamics LLC 10085 Windfern Rd. Houston, TX 77064 / US | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCANDREW, Charles, I. 37823 Windy Ridge Trail Magnolia, TX 77355 / US | 02 /
BRANDT, Travis, T. 1006 Hyde Park Dr. Round Rock, TX 78665 / US | 03 /
SNIDER, R., Ryan 20011 Crossvine Trail Lane Cypress, TX 77433 / US | 04 /
SWATZEL, Kenneth, D., III 18310 Mail Route Road Montgomery, TX 77316 / US | 05 /
COOK, Trey, D. 11723 Bistro Lane Houston, TX 77082 / US | 06 /
BREWER, Edward, R. 15000 Philippine Street 1217 Houston, TX 77040 / US | [2019/10] |
Former [2019/04] | 01 /
MCANDREW, Charles, I. 37823 Windy Ridge Trail Magnolia, TX 77355 / US | ||
02 /
BRANDT, Travis, T. 1127 Suwanee Lane Houston, TX 77090 / US | |||
03 /
SNIDER, R., Ryan 20011 Crossvine Trail Lane Cypress, TX 77433 / US | |||
04 /
SWATZEL, Kenneth, D., III 18310 Mail Route Road Montgomery, TX 77316 / US | |||
05 /
COOK, Trey, D. 11723 Bistro Lane Houston, TX 77082 / US | |||
06 /
BREWER, Edward, R. 15000 Philippine Street 1217 Houston, TX 77040 / US | Representative(s) | Slingsby Partners LLP 1 Kingsway London WC2B 6AN / GB | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 16894748.9 | 17.03.2016 | [2019/04] | WO2016US22743 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017160289 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429758 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B05B12/08, B05B12/10, B05B12/14, B05B7/16, // B01F3/20, B01F15/04 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
B05B12/1436 (EP);
B05B12/085 (EP);
B05B12/10 (EP);
B05B7/1693 (EP);
B01F23/711 (EP);
B01F35/831 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | B05B12/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR AUSGABE VON MEHRKOMPONENTIGEN CHEMISCHEN SPRAYS | [2019/04] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DISPENSING MULTIPLE COMPONENT CHEMICAL SPRAYS | [2019/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE JETS CHIMIQUES À CONSTITUANTS MULTIPLES | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 27.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]AT505858 (KOGELBAUER SIEGFRIED [AT]) [X] 1,2,4,10,12-15 * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [I] 3,5-9,11; | [Y]EP2790080 (CINETIC FILLING [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0039]; figure - * * paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]US5857589 (CLINE DAVID J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 6, paragraph 61 - column 7, paragraph 47; figure 1 *; | [Y]CN103464321 (LIAONING PROVINCIAL MACHINERY RES INST CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0032]; figure . *; | [A]DE102014209155 (WAGNER WILHELM WIWA [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US8561921 (SHOWMAN STEVE C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 14 - column 10, line 32; figures 3, 4 *; | [A]US6220747 (GOSSELIN MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 7, line 12 - column 10, line 17; figure - * * column 11, line 39 - column 12, line 5 * | International search | [A]WO2014099796 (GRACO MINNESOTA INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * entire documents *; | [A]US2007045445 (HACKEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]US5146946 (MAUGANS JAMES R [US]) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]US4562088 (NAVARRO RICHARD R [US]) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]US3880228 (HOUK CLIFFORD L, et al) [A] 1-17 * entire document * |