EP3397917 - VARYING BARREL CAMMING SYSTEM FOR FIREARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/45] | VARIABLE BARREL CAMMING SYSTEM FOR FIREARM | ||
[2020/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STURM, RUGER & COMPANY, INC. One Lacey Place Southport, CT 06890 / US | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAJK, Joseph J. 5520 Snapdragon Lane Prescott, Arizona 86305 / US | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2018/45] | Application number, filing date | 16895726.4 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016US68372 | Priority number, date | US201562271472P | 28.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562271472 P | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017164950 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3397917 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3397917 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F41A5/04, F41C3/00 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
F41C3/00 (EP,US);
F41A19/32 (US);
F41A17/56 (US);
F41A19/10 (US);
F41A19/12 (US);
F41A19/15 (US);
F41A19/30 (US);
F41A21/00 (US);
F41A5/04 (EP,US);
F41A5/06 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | F41A17/56, F41A17/64, F41A19/12, F41A19/15, F41A19/32, F41A21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VARIIERENDES LAUFNOCKENSYSTEM FÜR SCHUSSWAFFEN | [2020/52] | English: | VARYING BARREL CAMMING SYSTEM FOR FIREARM | [2020/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CAME PROGRESSIVE POUR CANON DESTINÉ À UNE ARME À FEU | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/45] | VARIABLES LAUFNOCKENSYSTEM FÜR SCHUSSWAFFEN | ||
Former [2018/45] | VARIABLE BARREL CAMMING SYSTEM FOR FIREARM | ||
Former [2018/45] | SYSTÈME DE CAME À CANON VARIABLE DESTINÉ À UNE ARME À FEU | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 30.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2016 | AL | 19.05.2021 | CY | 19.05.2021 | CZ | 19.05.2021 | DK | 19.05.2021 | EE | 19.05.2021 | ES | 19.05.2021 | FI | 19.05.2021 | HR | 19.05.2021 | LT | 19.05.2021 | LV | 19.05.2021 | MC | 19.05.2021 | MK | 19.05.2021 | NL | 19.05.2021 | PL | 19.05.2021 | RO | 19.05.2021 | RS | 19.05.2021 | SE | 19.05.2021 | SI | 19.05.2021 | SK | 19.05.2021 | SM | 19.05.2021 | BG | 19.08.2021 | NO | 19.08.2021 | GR | 20.08.2021 | IS | 19.09.2021 | PT | 20.09.2021 | GB | 22.12.2021 | IE | 22.12.2021 | LU | 22.12.2021 | FR | 31.12.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
GB | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 22.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
GB | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 22.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
GB | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 22.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
GB | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
GB | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
LU | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 19.05.2021 | |
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | FI | 19.05.2021 | |
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 19.05.2021 | |
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 19.05.2021 | |
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 19.05.2021 | |
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 19.05.2021 | |
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 19.05.2021 | |
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 19.05.2021 | |
LT | 19.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2664786 (BONIFACIO GUISASOLA) [X] 1,10,12 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 31; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-9,11,14-17 [I] 13; | [A]US6000162 (HOCHSTRATE PAUL M [US]) [A] 1-17* column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 27; figures 2, 2b *; | [XAI]US8453555 (KARFIOL YURY [US], et al) [X] 1,10-14,17 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 64; figures 1,3,5 * [A] 6-9,15,16 [I] 2-5 | International search | [A]US1618510 (BROWNING JOHN M) [A] 1-24 * , entire document *; | [A]US2664786 (BONIFACIO GUISASOLA) [A] 1-24 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 2, 3, 5; col 1, In 54 to col 2, In 3; col 2, In 12-21; col 2, In 31-34; col 3, In 61-62; col 3, In 69-72; *; | [A]US5734120 (BESSELINK BERNARD CHRISTIAN [AU]) [A] 1-24 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 2; col 8, In 33-35; col 8, In 1-6; col 8, In 13-16; *; | [A]US2010005956 (WOSSNER ERNST [DE]) [A] 1-24 * , entire document *; | [A]US2011289811 (GENTILINI CLAUDIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-24 * , entire document *; | [A]US2015292828 (NEBEKER DARIN [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * , entire document *; | [T]US2017184358 (ZAJK JOSEPH J [US]) [T] 1-24* , entire document * |