EP3435574 - FEEDBACK METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRECODING MATRIX INDICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Ruiqi Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Jianqin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16896061.5 | 01.04.2016 | [2019/05] | WO2016CN78298 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017166281 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3435574 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0456, H04B7/06, H04L1/06 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
H04B7/0639 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0478 (US);
H04B7/0456 (CN,KR);
H04B7/0486 (CN);
H04B7/0645 (KR);
H04B7/0658 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | H04L1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | RÜCKMELDEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORCODIERUNG EINER MATRIXANZEIGE | [2019/05] | English: | FEEDBACK METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRECODING MATRIX INDICATION | [2019/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉTROACTION POUR UNE INDICATION DE MATRICE DE PRÉCODAGE | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2018 | Translation filed | 22.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 23.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 10.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.12.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP2985921 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-5,7-12,14-16 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0097] *[A] 6,13 | International search | [X]CN103780331 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [X] 1-40 * , description, paragraphs [0036]-[0080] and [0144]-[0157] *; | [A]CN101877684 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-40 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103746779 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-40 * , the whole document * |