EP3441086 - ANTI-PD-1 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akeso Biopharma, Inc. 6 Shennong Boulevard Torch developmental Zone Zhongshan, Guangdong 528437 / CN | For all designated states Taizhou Hanzhong Biopharmaceutics, Inc. No.1 of China Medical City Road Taizhou, Jiangsu 225316 / CN | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIA, Yu 6 Shennong Blvd Torch developmental Zone Zhongshan Guangdong 528437 / CN | 02 /
LI, Baiyong 6 Shennong Blvd Torch developmental Zone Zhongshan Guangdong 528437 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Zhongmin Maxwell 6 Shennong Blvd Torch developmental Zone Zhongshan Guangdong 528437 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Faming Biolake B6-515, Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | 05 /
XI, Gan Biolake B6-515, Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | 06 /
HUANG, Ying Biolake B6-515, Eastlake National High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Rössler, Matthias karo IP Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels PartG mbB Postfach 32 01 02 40416 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/50] |
Former [2019/07] | Rössler, Matthias Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels Patentanwälte PartG mbB (Karo IP Professionals) Postfach 32 01 02 40416 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16896573.9 | 28.10.2016 | [2019/07] | WO2016CN103814 | Priority number, date | CN201610207741 | 01.04.2016 Original published format: CN201610207741 | [2019/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017166804 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441086 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3441086 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/28 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
C07K16/2818 (EP,CN,US);
A61K45/06 (CN);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (CN,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/74 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONOKLONALER ANTI-PD-1-ANTIKÖRPER | [2019/07] | English: | ANTI-PD-1 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY | [2019/07] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL ANTI-PD-1 | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2018 | Translation filed | 25.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 21.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2021 | 17.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2016 | AL | 15.12.2021 | AT | 15.12.2021 | CY | 15.12.2021 | CZ | 15.12.2021 | EE | 15.12.2021 | HR | 15.12.2021 | LT | 15.12.2021 | LV | 15.12.2021 | MC | 15.12.2021 | MK | 15.12.2021 | PL | 15.12.2021 | RO | 15.12.2021 | RS | 15.12.2021 | SI | 15.12.2021 | SK | 15.12.2021 | SM | 15.12.2021 | BG | 15.03.2022 | NO | 15.03.2022 | GR | 16.03.2022 | IS | 15.04.2022 | PT | 18.04.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 28.10.2016 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 28.10.2016 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 15.12.2021 | |
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | HR | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | HR | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | HR | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | LT | 15.12.2021 | |
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 15.12.2021 | |
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 15.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004056875 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-15* examples 1-10; claims 1-34 *; | [I]WO2006121168 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * examples 1-25; claims 1-105 *; | [I]WO2011110621 (UCB PHARMA SA [BE], et al) [I] 1-15 * examples 1-4; claims 1-26 * | Examination | WO2014055648 |