EP3438468 - CONSTRUCTION MACHINE WITH SPEED-UP CONTROL SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/06] | CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | ||
[2021/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 16-1, HigashiUeno 2-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0015 / JP | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIKI Hidekazu c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
SAKAMOTO Hiroshi c/o HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA Hiroaki c/o HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 04 /
TSURUGA Yasutaka c/o HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | [2021/41] |
Former [2019/06] | 01 /
MORIKI Hidekazu c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | ||
02 /
SAKAMOTO Hiroshi c/o Tsuchiura Works HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA Hiroaki c/o Tsuchiura Works HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
04 /
TSURUGA Yasutaka c/o Tsuchiura Works HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 16897038.2 | 17.11.2016 | [2019/06] | WO2016JP84103 | Priority number, date | JP20160070130 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016070130 | [2019/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017168822 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3438468 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3438468 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/028, E02F3/43, E02F9/22, F15B11/02, F15B11/044, F15B11/08, F15B11/17, E02F9/20 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
E02F9/2292 (EP);
E02F9/2221 (KR,US);
E02F3/43 (KR,US);
E02F9/2029 (EP);
E02F9/2242 (EP);
E02F9/2267 (KR,US);
F15B11/02 (EP);
F15B11/028 (EP,KR,US);
F15B11/044 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | F15B11/028, E02F3/43, E02F9/22, F15B11/02, F15B11/044, F15B11/08, F15B11/17 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINE MIT BESCHLEUNIGUNGSSTEUEREINRICHTUNG | [2021/33] | English: | CONSTRUCTION MACHINE WITH SPEED-UP CONTROL SECTION | [2021/33] | French: | MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION COMPORTANT UN CONTROLLEUR D'ACCELERATION | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/06] | BAUMASCHINEN | ||
Former [2019/06] | CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | ||
Former [2019/06] | MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2018 | Translation filed | 31.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 17.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2016 | AL | 26.01.2022 | AT | 26.01.2022 | CY | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | DK | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | ES | 26.01.2022 | FI | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | IT | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | MK | 26.01.2022 | MT | 26.01.2022 | NL | 26.01.2022 | PL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SE | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 17.11.2016 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
MK | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 17.11.2016 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.11.2016 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 26.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2518218 (DOOSAN INFRACORE CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0014]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2015137329 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1,4 * | International search | [A]JP2007100779 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0009], [0017] to [0032]; fig. 1(a), 2 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH10176347 (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACH) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0017], [0019] to [0023]; fig. 1, 3 to 5 (Family: none) * |