EP3429125 - TRAFFIC CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS IN SOFTWARE DEFINED NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Wenming Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16897536.5 | 06.04.2016 | [2019/03] | WO2016CN78537 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017173601 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429125 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/819 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
H04L47/215 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (US);
H04L41/0806 (EP,US);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/342 (EP);
H04L47/25 (US);
H04L45/64 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | VERKEHRSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG IN SOFTWARE-DEFINIERTEM NETZWERK | [2019/03] | English: | TRAFFIC CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS IN SOFTWARE DEFINED NETWORK | [2019/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉGULATION DE TRAFIC DANS UN RÉSEAU DÉFINI PAR UN LOGICIEL | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2018 | Translation filed | 10.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 14.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 13.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP2661027 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1,2,6-9,14,15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0085]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3-5,10-13; | [IA]EP2782298 (NEC CORP [JP]) [I] 1,2,6-9,14,15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0073]; figure -; claim - *[A] 3-5,10-13; | [IA]CN104301248 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD) [I] 1,2,6-9,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,10-13 | International search | [A]CN101635730 (SHENZHEN YONGDA ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN102118314 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-16 * , claims 1-10, and description, paragraphs [0005] and [0006] *; | [A]US2014050094 (BRANCH JOEL W [US], et al) [A] 1-16* , the whole document *; | [A]CN104734989 (TENCENT DIGITAL TIANJIN CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document * |