EP3439601 - WEARABLE ARTICLE HAVING GRAPHICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Koichi No. 35 Yu'an Road B Zone Tianzhu Konggang Development Zone Shunyi District Beijing 101312 / CN | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2019/07] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 16897671.0 | 30.06.2016 | [2019/07] | WO2016CN87826 | Priority number, date | WO2016CN78773 | 08.04.2016 Original published format: PCT/CN2016/078773 | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017173738 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439601 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3439601 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.10.2017 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | EP | 17.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/49, A61F13/513, A61F13/514, A61F13/84 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
A61F13/51394 (EP);
A61F13/49009 (EP);
A61F13/49011 (EP);
A61F13/49012 (EP);
A61F13/51496 (EP);
A61F13/8405 (EP);
A61F2013/8497 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | A61F13/496, A61F13/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEARABLE-ARTIKEL ARTIKEL MIT GRAFIK | [2019/07] | English: | WEARABLE ARTICLE HAVING GRAPHICS | [2019/07] | French: | ARTICLE POUVANT ÊTRE PORTÉ PRÉSENTANT DES GRAPHIQUES | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 10.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008107804 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [X] 12 * page 1, line 22 - page 3, line 27 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 11 ** figures 1a-1d *; | [X]US2010298799 (WHEELER KATHERINE C [US]) [X] 1-11,13,14 * figure 1 * * page 1, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 2, paragraph 25 * * page 3, paragraph 31 - page 4, paragraph 34 *; | [X]US2013310798 (GLAHN TINA MARIE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-7 * * page 2, paragraph 24 * * page 3, paragraph 39 - page 5, paragraph 51 *; | [X]US2013306226 (ZINK RONALD JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 7,8,11-17 * * page 13, paragraph 118 - page 14, paragraph 120 *; | [X]WO2013170433 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-11,13-15 * page 5, lines 4-22 * * pages 1-7 *; | [X]EP2682081 (UNICHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10-12 * page 2, paragraphs 1,13-17 * * page 6, paragraph 57 - page 7 * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]WO2016048337 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 22, paragraph 55 - page 23 * * figures 1-3 * | International search | [XY]US2004243083 (MATSUDA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5, 7-8, 12-14 * description paragraphs [0024]-[0026], [0031], [0041]-[0044]description paragraphs [0024]-[0026], [0031], [0041]-[0044] * [Y] 6, 9-11, 15; | [A]CN1561189 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103402473 (UNICHARM CORP) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2013310798 (GLAHN TINA MARIE [US], et al) [Y] 6, 9-11, 15 * description paragraphs [0044]-[0047] * |