EP3439527 - FOLD AWAY CUTLERY RACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products, Inc. 10200 David Taylor Drive Charlotte, NC 28262 / US | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHAL, Justin D. 801 66th Ave. N. Apt. 4 Myrtle Beach, South Carolina 29572 / US | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 16898123.1 | 08.04.2016 | [2019/07] | WO2016US26704 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017176286 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439527 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/50, A47B77/14 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A47L15/502 (EP,US);
A47L15/503 (EP,US);
A47L15/505 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | A47L15/50, A47B77/14, A47L15/24, A47L15/26, A47L15/33, A47L15/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENKLAPPBARER BESTECKKORB | [2019/07] | English: | FOLD AWAY CUTLERY RACK | [2019/07] | French: | PANIER À COUVERTS ESCAMOTABLE | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 02.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/32] | 02.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2292140 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [X] 1,3 * column 5, paragraph [0026] - column 6, paragraph [0035]; figures 1-7 * [A] 4-11,13-15 [I] 2,12; | [A]WO2013098009 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102013103707 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]DE4309915 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3, 15-20 * machine translation *; | [Y]US5462348 (ELLINGSON DAVID I [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 15, 16, 20 * entire document *; | [A]EP1475030 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3, 15-20 * entire document *; | [Y]EP2322074 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-3, 15, 16, 20 * entire document *; | [A]US2013247944 (FISCHER MARCUS R [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 15-20* entire document * | by applicant | EP2292140 |