EP3457043 - AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMURA, Kenta c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Yohei c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 16901713.4 | 13.05.2016 | [2019/12] | WO2016JP64362 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017195365 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457043 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3457043 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/88, F24F11/36, F24F11/52, // F25B49/00 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
F24F11/52 (EP);
F24F11/36 (EP);
F24F11/88 (EP);
F25B49/005 (EP);
F24F1/005 (EP);
F25B2400/12 (EP);
F25B2500/222 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | F24F11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE | [2019/12] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER | [2019/12] | French: | CLIMATISEUR | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2018 | Translation filed | 30.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 09.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2016 | AL | 08.09.2021 | AT | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | ES | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | IT | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | NL | 08.09.2021 | PL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | IE | 13.05.2022 | LU | 13.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | FR | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 13.05.2016 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 13.05.2022 | ||
LU | 13.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.05.2016 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 13.05.2022 | ||
LU | 13.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 13.05.2022 | ||
LU | 13.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 13.05.2022 | ||
LU | 13.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 13.05.2022 | ||
LU | 13.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
LU | 13.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
LU | 13.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
LU | 13.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010163635 (YE LEO [CN]) [A] 1-3* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0048] *; | [YA]JP2012193884 (FUJI KOKI KK) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0058] * [A] 2,3; | [A]WO2013038704 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] *; | [Y]US2015156031 (FADELL ANTHONY MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0276] - paragraph [0276] *; | [A]WO2015194596 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0036] * | International search | [YA]JP2012193884 (FUJI KOKI KK) [Y] 1, 2 * , paragraphs [0001], [0018] to [0036]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 3, 4; | [Y]JPH1164427 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 1, 2 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0033]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015094566 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 1, 2 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0064]; fig. 1 to 11 & WO 2015/072270 A *; | [Y]JP2009069934 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 2 * , paragraph [0132] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014082085 (TOKYO GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK) [Y] 2 * , paragraph [0019] (Family: none) * |