EP3455431 - METHOD FOR INSTALLING TILES IN A WALL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIRTT Environmental Solutions, Ltd. 7303 30th Street SE Calgary, Alberta T2C 1N6 / CA | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TISDALL, Mark 96 Prestwick Hts Calgary, Alberta T2Z 4H8 / CA | 02 /
CASSIE, Brian 632 Morena Place SW Calgary, Alberta T3H 2W9 / CA | 03 /
HOVDEBO, Kenton Box 166 131 2nd Street S. Lomond, Alberta T0L 1G0 / CA | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 16901823.1 | 10.05.2016 | [2019/12] | WO2016US31657 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017196305 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3455431 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08, E04C2/38, B65D81/05, B65D85/46, E04F19/06, E04F13/14 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
E04F13/088 (EP,US);
E04F21/18 (US);
E04B2/72 (US);
E04F19/06 (EP);
E04F13/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | E04F13/08, E04C2/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INSTALLATION VON FLIESEN IN EINEM WANDSYSTEM | [2019/12] | English: | METHOD FOR INSTALLING TILES IN A WALL SYSTEM | [2019/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION DE CARREAUX DANS UN SYSTÈME DE MUR | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 26.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/27] | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009288350 (FORTMAN DANIEL [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7,8,11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0023] - [0030] * * figures 1,7a,7b * [I] 2,4,6,9,10,12,13; | [XI]US2015147531 (ANSPACH KEAN M [US]) [X] 1,3,7,8,11 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0021] - [0023] - [0032] - [0034] - [0038] * * figures 1-7 *[I] 2,4-6,9,10,12,13 | International search | [A]US3309832 (FILSINGER ELMER J) [A] 1-25 * See column 1, lines 10-15; column 2, line 37 - column 4, line 6; and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US3953268 (DILLON ELMER D) [A] 1-25 * See column 1, lines 13-16; column 2, lines 18-44; and figures 2-3. *; | [Y]US4443508 (MEHL DONALD N [US]) [Y] 22-24 * See column 1, line 29 - column 3, line 44; and figures 1-4. *; | [XY]US4775570 (OHLENFORST HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1-21, 25 * See column 1, line 8 - column 5, line 28; and figures 1-6. * [Y] 22-24; | [A]EP1206610 (NEWELL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-25* See paragraphs [0001], [0013]-[0021]; and figures 1-6. * |