EP3457979 - ATTACHMENT COMPONENT, NAVIGATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRACKING A SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortoma AB Vädursgatan 5 412 50 Gothenburg / SE | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Matts Hammarströms täppa 2 443 39 Lerum / SE | 02 /
RIIHINEN, Pasi Häradsgatan 30B 431 42 Mölndal / SE | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Byström, Kurt Linus Linecto AB Tofsvipegatan 20 422 43 Hisings Backa / SE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 16902559.0 | 14.11.2016 | [2019/13] | WO2016SE51118 | Priority number, date | SE20160050650 | 15.05.2016 Original published format: SE 1650650 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017200444 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457979 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
A61B34/20 (EP,SE,US);
A61B17/1659 (US);
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B34/25 (EP,US);
A61B90/08 (US);
A61B90/98 (US);
G16H40/63 (US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00725 (EP,US);
A61B2034/104 (US);
A61B2034/105 (US);
A61B2034/107 (US);
A61B2034/2048 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,SE,US);
A61B2034/207 (SE);
A61B2034/2072 (US);
A61B2090/0811 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSKOMPONENTE, NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERFOLGUNG EINES CHIRURGISCHEN INSTRUMENTS | [2019/13] | English: | ATTACHMENT COMPONENT, NAVIGATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRACKING A SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [2019/13] | French: | COMPOSANT DE FIXATION, SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE SUIVI D'UN INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 31.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/14] | 20.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.2020 | 30.11.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5617857 (CHADER MARTIN D [US], et al) [A] 11-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2005020909 (MOCTEZUMA DE LA BARRERA JOSE L [DE], et al) [A] 11-14 * figures 1,2, * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] *; | [X]EP1570791 (ZIMMER TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0031] *; | [A]US2006264742 (NEUBAUER TIMO [DE], et al) [A] 11-14 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] *; | [A]US2008200926 (VERARD LAURENT [US], et al) [A] 11-14 * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0040] ** paragraph [0051] *; | [X]DE102007014737 (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0072] *; | [X]US2011071389 (SIMON DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 3A-4B * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]US2011275957 (BHANDARI SACHIN [US]) [A] 11-14 * paragraph [0090]; figures 1,3A,3D * * paragraph [0096] *; | [X]US2014073914 (LAVALLEE STEPHANE [FR], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure 7 * * paragraph [0155] - paragraph [0158] *; | [A]US2015164606 (JACOBS SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 11-14 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * | International search | [A]US5921992 (COSTALES JAMES B [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * ; column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 5 *; | [XY]US5987960 (MESSNER DALE A [US], et al) [X] 1-8, 11-14 * ; column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 50; figure 1B * [Y] 9-10; | [XA]US6190395 (WILLIAMS THOMAS R [US]) [X] 1-8, 11-14 * ; column 4, line 4 - column 7, line 54; figure 2 * [A] 9-10; | [XA]US2004097952 (SARIN VINEET KUMAR [US], et al) [X] 1-8, 11-14 * ; paragraphs [0060]-[0061], [0070]; figures 5,7,13 * [A] 9-10; | [XA]US2004267242 (GRIMM JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1-8, 11-14 * ; paragraphs [0032]-[0048], [0055]; figures 1A,2A-D,3A-B * [A] 9-10; | [XA]US2007016009 (LAKIN RYAN C [US], et al) [X] 1-8, 11-14 * ; paragraphs [0030], [0050]-[0062]; figures 5A-D,8A-C * [A] 9-10; | [XY]US2007175489 (MOCTEZUMA DE LA BARRERA JOSE L [DE], et al) [X] 1-8, 11-14 * ; paragraphs [0037][0040], [0045]-[0048], [0051]; figures 1,15,17 * [Y] 9-10; | [XA]US2009088630 (MOCTEZUMA DE LA BARRERA JOSE LUIS [DE], et al) [X] 1-8, 11-14 * ; paragraphs [0050][0055], [0064]; figures 2,16,22 * [A] 9-10; | [X]US2009163930 (AOUDE AHMED [CA], et al) [X] 1-14 * ; paragraphs [0016]-[0019], [0025]-[0027], [0032][0035]; figures 3,5,6 *; | [YA]WO2014025305 (ORTOMA AB [SE]) [Y] 9-10 * ; page 21, line 5 - page 33, line 5; figures 10b-c,11ae,12 * [A] 1-8, 11-14; | [A]US2014257332 (ZASTROZNA ANNA [US]) [A] 1-14* ; paragraphs [0025], [0036]-[0038] *; | [A]US2015182293 (YANG VICTOR X D [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * ; paragraphs [0008]-[0015], [0064]; figures 3,6 *; | [XA]WO2016023599 (BRAINLAB AG [DE]) [X] 1-8, 11-14 * ; page 6, line 21 - page 10, line 15; figures 1A-D * [A] 9-10 |