EP3458272 - PRINTING USING FIDUCIAL MARKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMINGO, Xavier Hewlett-Packard Espanola S.L. Cami de Can Graells 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 02 /
QIAN, Li Hewlett-Packard Espanola S.L. Cami de Can Graells 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 03 /
VICENTE VICENTE, Secundino Hewlett-Packard Espanola S.L. Cami de Can Graells 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 16902569.9 | 16.05.2016 | [2019/13] | WO2016US32648 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017200520 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458272 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/24, B41J3/60, B41J11/46 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B41J11/46 (EP,US);
B41J3/60 (EP);
G06F3/1208 (US);
G06F3/1234 (US);
G06F3/125 (US);
G06V10/245 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | B41J11/42, B41J11/00, G06K9/62, B41J3/60, B41J11/46, G06K9/32 | ||
Former IPC [2019/13] | B41J11/42, B41J11/00, G06K9/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | DRUCKEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MARKIERUNGEN | [2019/13] | English: | PRINTING USING FIDUCIAL MARKS | [2019/13] | French: | IMPRESSION À L'AIDE DE REPÈRES | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.03.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.03.2023 | 10.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/30] | 20.03.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/30] | 28.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6861186 (PAGETTE FRANCOIS [US], et al) [I] 1-15* figure 2; claim 1 *; | [I]WO2015147820 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs 19, 20, and 27 * | International search | [A]US2011164293 (EOM YOON-SEOP [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0028], [0029], claims 1-5, and figures 4, 5. *; | [A]US2011194131 (HUNTER JONATHAN B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0028], claims 1-20, and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]US2013293613 (BEREL DAN [IL]) [Y] 7 * See abstract, paragraph [0044], and figure 1. *; | [A]US2013328994 (MARTTILA TOM [FI]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0036]-[0038], claims 1-3, and figures 1, 2. *; | [XY]US2015210099 (BARRON RODOLFO JODRA [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 8-15 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0026], [0031], claims 1-3, 12, 17, and figures 1-6b. * [Y] 7 |