EP3451742 - TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR SYSTEM MESSAGE, AND RELATED DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIA, Xiaoqian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LUO, Haiyan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Hongzhuo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Li Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 16902710.9 | 26.05.2016 | [2019/10] | WO2016CN83553 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017201720 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3451742 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3451742 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/08, H04W74/00, H04W48/12, H04W74/08 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W48/20 (US);
H04W74/00 (EP,US);
H04W76/27 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/10] | H04W48/08, H04W74/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SYSTEMNACHRICHTEN SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2019/10] | English: | TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR SYSTEM MESSAGE, AND RELATED DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2019/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DESTINÉ À UN MESSAGE DE SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ, ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2018 | Translation filed | 30.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 07.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | DK | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | IT | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2070366 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,7,14,15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0018] - [0 46] , [0 47] *; | [X] - SAMSUNG, "System Information Signalling Design in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-163371_SYSTEM INFORMATION SIGNALING DESIGN IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160522), XP051104902 [X] 1-15 * pages 3,6 * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Preliminary view on Initial Access in 5G", vol. RAN WG2, no. Dubrovnik, Croatia; 20160411 - 20160415, (20160404), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-162300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_93bis/Docs/, (20160404), XP051082676 [A] 1-15 * proposal 2; page 2 * | International search | [A]CN101860939 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [Y]CN102045685 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1, 2, 4, 7, 10-12, 14, 17, 20-24 * description, paragraphs [0014]-[0038] *; | [Y]CN102625461 (ZTE CORP) [Y] 1, 2, 4, 7, 10-12, 14, 17, 20-24 * description, paragraphs [0046]-[0101] *; | [A]US2012276933 (LAITINEN PASI PETTERI [FI]) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [A]CN103906167 (DATANG MOBILE TECHNOLOGIES CO) [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | Examination | EP2070366 | US2016112164 | - IPWIRELESS INC, "Layer 1 signalling based counting method for E-MBMS", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-104531, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100816), vol. RAN WG2, no. Madrid, Spain; 20100823, XP050451711 |