EP3481306 - STORAGE ASSEMBLY FOR A MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker European Holdings I, LLC 2825 Airview Boulevard Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEEDE, Andreas Op de Koppel 51 24539 Neumünster / DE | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16908332.6 | 08.07.2016 | [2019/20] | WO2016US41518 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018009215 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3481306 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, A61B17/06, A61B50/00, A61B50/20, A61B50/30, A61B50/33, A61F2/00 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B50/00 (EP,US);
A61B50/20 (EP,US);
A61B50/33 (EP,US);
A61F2/0095 (EP);
B21D22/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/20] | A61B17/04, A61B17/06, A61B50/00, A61B50/20, A61B50/30, A61B50/33 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | AUFBEWAHRUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/20] | English: | STORAGE ASSEMBLY FOR A MEDICAL DEVICE | [2019/20] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE STOCKAGE POUR UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 18.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 08.02.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011278188 (STEINHARDT UWE [DE], et al) [X] 1-11,16,17 * figure 1 * * figure 5a * * figure 5c * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0049] * [I] 12-15,18-20; | [A]WO2013119850 (ESTES DESIGN AND MFG INC [US]) [A] 19 * figure 1D * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] *; | [XI]WO2016057102 (RICHMAN LAWRENCE [US]) [X] 1 * figure 28 * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0118] *[I] 19 | International search | [Y]US5384103 (MILLER CURTIS H [US]) [Y] 19, 20 * entire document *; | [XY]US2011278188 (STEINHARDT UWE [DE], et al) [X] 1-3, 16 * entire document * [Y] 19, 20; | [Y]US2014078854 (HEAD BRIAN R [US], et al) [Y] 19, 20* entire document * |