EP3492610 - HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/27] |
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIMURA Masahide c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
MINAGAWA Masanori c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
KAWABATA Norimasa c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 04 /
TSUZUKI Takeshi c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 16910563.2 | 29.07.2016 | [2019/23] | WO2016JP72316 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018020660 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492610 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3492610 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C22C38/14, C22C38/58, C21D1/02, C21D1/60, C21D9/46, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/32, C22C38/38, C22C38/40 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
C21D1/02 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR);
C21D1/60 (EP);
C21D8/0226 (EP);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP);
C22C38/001 (EP,KR);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/005 (EP,KR);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/08 (KR);
C22C38/12 (EP,KR);
C22C38/14 (EP,KR);
C22C38/16 (KR);
C22C38/20 (EP);
C22C38/22 (EP);
C22C38/24 (EP);
C22C38/26 (EP);
C22C38/28 (EP);
C22C38/32 (EP);
C22C38/38 (EP);
C22C38/40 (EP);
C21D2211/002 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/23] | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C22C38/14, C22C38/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFESTES STAHLBLECH | [2021/10] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL SHEET | [2019/23] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE | [2019/23] |
Former [2019/23] | ULTRAHOCHFESTES STAHLBLECH | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2018 | Translation filed | 30.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 31.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2016 | AL | 24.03.2021 | CY | 24.03.2021 | CZ | 24.03.2021 | DK | 24.03.2021 | EE | 24.03.2021 | ES | 24.03.2021 | FI | 24.03.2021 | HR | 24.03.2021 | IT | 24.03.2021 | LT | 24.03.2021 | LV | 24.03.2021 | MC | 24.03.2021 | MK | 24.03.2021 | NL | 24.03.2021 | PL | 24.03.2021 | RO | 24.03.2021 | RS | 24.03.2021 | SI | 24.03.2021 | SK | 24.03.2021 | SM | 24.03.2021 | BG | 24.06.2021 | NO | 24.06.2021 | GR | 25.06.2021 | IS | 24.07.2021 | PT | 26.07.2021 | GB | 29.07.2021 | IE | 29.07.2021 | LU | 29.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 29.07.2016 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | CZ | 24.03.2021 | |
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | CZ | 24.03.2021 | |
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 24.03.2021 | |
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 24.03.2021 | |
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
NO | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2011052321 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]EP2612945 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2881486 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL [CN]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2008184638 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-10 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010070845 (KOREA MACH & MATERIALS INST) [A] 1-10* , & KR 10-2010-0032490 A & CN 101676430 A *; | [YA]JP2011052321 (JFE STEEL CORP) [Y] 1-7, 9-10 * , claims; paragraphs [0034], [0035]; examples (Family: none) * [A] 8; | [A]WO2011142285 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * , & JP 4897125 B2 & CN 102712972 A *; | [YA]WO2012060405 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7, 9-10 * , claims; paragraphs [0044], [0045]; examples & JP 5037744 B2 & EP 2612945 A1 claims; paragraphs [0041], [0042]; examples & KR 10-2013-0051518 A & CN 103189537 A & TW 201226582 A * [A] 8; | [A]JP2014047414 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 1-10 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014154104 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL [CN]) [A] 1-10 * , & JP 2016-509630 A & US 2016/0002759 A1 & EP 2980255 A & CN 103146997 A & KR 10-2015-0086552 A *; | [YA]JP2014529686 (Baoshan Iron & Steel Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1-7, 9-10 * , claims; paragraphs [0009], [0019], [0023] to [0038]; examples; tables 1 to 3 & US 2015/0211098 A1 claims; paragraphs [0010], [0020], [0025] to [0039]; examples; tables 1 to 3 & WO 2014/019352 A1 & EP 2881486 A1 & CN 102747280 A & KR 10-2015-0034580 A * [A] 8 |