EP3446266 - WORKFLOW-AUTHORIZING COMPUTING DEVICE AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMSKE, Steven J. 3390 E. Harmony Rd. Fort Collins, Colorado 80528 / US | 02 /
ARONOFF, Jason S. 3390 E. Harmony Rd. Fort Collins, Colorado 80528 / US | 03 /
GAUBATZ, Matthew D. 8470 Fauntleroy Pl. SW Seattle, Washington 98136 / US | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16910767.9 | 29.07.2016 | [2019/09] | WO2016US44868 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022109 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3446266 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0185 (EP,US);
G06K19/06037 (US);
G06K7/1417 (US);
G06Q10/06 (EP);
G06Q10/087 (EP);
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G06Q30/0601 (EP);
H04L63/083 (US);
H04L63/0861 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINER WORKFLOW-AUTORISIERENDEN COMPUTERVORRICHTUNG | [2019/09] | English: | WORKFLOW-AUTHORIZING COMPUTING DEVICE AUTHENTICATION | [2019/09] | French: | AUTHENTIFICATION DE DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE D'AUTORISATION DE FLUX DE TRAVAIL | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 03.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/29] | 15.06.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.10.2022 | 13.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003141358 (HUDSON PHILIP [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0107] *; | [I]WO2012087270 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] *; | [I]US2012314954 (MOORE JOHN A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045] *; | [I]US2014122585 (DELONG KYLE WILLIAM [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0057] ** paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0067] *; | [I]US2015081899 (QU LIDONG [CN]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0113] * * figures 2-4 *; | [I]US2015095992 (METRAL MAX EDWARD [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0039] *; | [I]WO2015102857 (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * | International search | [XA]US2013290963 (SIMSKE STEVEN J [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 6-12 * , abstract, paragraphs [0034], [0039], [0043], [0054]-[0055], [0062], [0116]-[0123], [0179], fig. 8 * [A] 5, 13-15 |