EP3491652 - TANK CLOSURE CESIUM REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company LLC 1000 Westinghouse Drive Suite 141 Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | [2023/32] |
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company LLC 1000 Westinghouse Drive Suite 141 Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECK, Mark A. 1613 Hunt Avenue Richland, Washington 99354 / US | 02 /
GAMMON, Thomas J. 332 Riverwood Street Richland, Washington 99352 / US | 03 /
HARTING, Gregory B. 514 East Ridgeway Hermiston, Oregon 97838 / US | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Steinerstraße 15/A 81369 München / DE | [2023/32] |
Former [2019/23] | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 16910777.8 | 20.09.2016 | [2019/23] | WO2016US52583 | Priority number, date | US201662368543P | 29.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662368543 P | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022119 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491652 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3491652 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/12, G21F5/10, B01D15/22, B01D15/36, B01J47/022, B01J47/024, C02F1/42, C02F101/00, C02F103/34, G21F3/00 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
G21F9/12 (EP,US);
B01D15/22 (EP,US);
B01D15/361 (EP,US);
B01J47/022 (EP,US);
B01J47/024 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
G21F3/00 (EP,US);
C02F2101/006 (EP,US);
C02F2103/34 (EP,US);
C02F2201/002 (EP,US);
C02F2201/006 (US);
C02F2201/007 (US);
C02F2201/008 (US);
G21F5/005 (US);
G21F5/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/23] | G21F9/12, G21F5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CÄSIUMENTFERNUNG VON EINEM TANKVERSCHLUSS | [2019/23] | English: | TANK CLOSURE CESIUM REMOVAL | [2019/23] | French: | ÉLIMINATION DU CÉSIUM POUR MISE HORS SERVICE DE RÉSERVOIR | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 29.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | IE | 20.09.2023 | LU | 20.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | DE | 03.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
IE | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
DE | 03.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
IE | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
DE | 03.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013085644 (SHAW GLOBAL SERVICES LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1* paragraph [0042]; claim 1 *; | [XY]US2014263073 (BARKER TRACY A [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0033] - [0037] - [0055] - [0064] - [0072] - [0076] - [0078]; figures 1A,2,8-12; claims 3,11,20 * [Y] 1 | International search | [A]US2012088949 (HUSSEY DENNIS FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * See paragraphs 52-55 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]WO2013191781 (KURION INC [US]) [A] 1-7* See paragraphs 25-26, and figure 1. *; | [X]US2014263073 (BARKER TRACY A [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * See paragraphs 33-37, 55-64, 78, claims 3, 11, 20, and figures IA-2, 8-12. *; | [A]US8986424 (NEBEKER NEIL [US]) [A] 1-7 * See column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 21, and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2015215186 (KUDO TOSHIAKI) [A] 1-7 * See paragraphs 14-21, claim 1, and figure 1. * |