EP3496410 - INTERACTION METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TELEVISION AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen TCL New Technology Co., LTD 7/F., D4 TCL S&T Building TCL International E City No. 1001 Zhongshan Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAO, Jian 7/F. D4 TCL S&T Building TCL International E City No.1001 Zhongshan Park Road Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 16911521.9 | 27.12.2016 | [2019/24] | WO2016CN112311 | Priority number, date | CN201610629943 | 03.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610629943 | [2019/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018023926 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496410 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/472, H04N21/436, H04N21/441 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
H04N21/436 (EP,US);
H04N21/23418 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/2381 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/26208 (CN,US);
H04N21/4108 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/441 (EP,US);
H04N21/4524 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/472 (US);
H04N21/4722 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Title | German: | INTERAKTIONSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM FÜR FERNSEHEN UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2019/24] | English: | INTERACTION METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TELEVISION AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2019/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'INTERACTION POUR TÉLÉVISEUR ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2019/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2019 | Translation filed | 05.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 09.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2022 | 21.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/24] | 12.02.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2560402 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0 64]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]CN104010222 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [I]CN105263055 (KONKA GROUP CO LTD) [I] 1-17 * the whole document * |