EP3497134 - IMMUNE-MODULATING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Council of the Queensland Institute of Medical Research 300 Herston Road Herston, Queensland 4006 / AU | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYKES, Michelle 51 Mount Street Toowong, Queensland 4066 / AU | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16911787.6 | 11.08.2016 | [2019/25] | WO2016AU50726 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018027252 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3497134 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K19/00, A61K38/17, C12N15/62, A61P35/00, A61P37/04, A61P37/02, A61P31/00, A61P33/00 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
C07K14/70532 (KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/00 (EP,KR);
A61P33/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/04 (US);
A61P37/02 (EP,US);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/7051 (EP);
C12N15/62 (EP,KR);
C07K2319/00 (KR);
C07K2319/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | IMMUNMODULIERENDE VERBINDUNGEN | [2019/25] | English: | IMMUNE-MODULATING COMPOUNDS | [2019/25] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE MODULATION IMMUNITAIRE | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 08.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 20.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0149866 (APOTECH RES & DEV LTD [CH], et al); | [X]WO2010027827 (AMPLIMMUNE INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2014121085 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US]) | International search | [X]WO2010037402 (DAKO DENMARK AS [DK], et al); | [X]US2012269859 (MINATO NAGAHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]WO2015195531 (EINSTEIN COLL MED [US]); | [X]WO2016008005 (QUEENSLAND INST MED RES [AU]); | [A]WO2016022994 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | [A]WO2016090347 (IMMUNEXT INC [US], et al); |