EP3496477 - PAGING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM, AND RELATED COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/24] | PAGING METHOD AND PAGING DEVICE | ||
[2022/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/40] |
Former [2019/24] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Bingzhao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
QUAN, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Jian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/40] |
Former [2019/24] | 01 /
LI, Bingzhao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
WANG, Yan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
QUAN, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Jian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/40] |
Former [2019/24] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16912450.0 | 12.08.2016 | [2019/24] | WO2016CN95062 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018027995 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496477 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3496477 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/02 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
H04W68/02 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04W68/005 (CN,KR,US);
H04W24/02 (RU);
H04W36/0033 (US);
H04W48/20 (US);
H04W76/27 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAGING-VERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM, UND ZUGEHÖRIGES COMPUTER-LESBARES MEDIUM | [2022/15] | English: | PAGING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM, AND RELATED COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2022/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE RADIORECHERCHE, ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉ | [2022/15] |
Former [2019/24] | PAGINGVERFAHREN UND PAGINGVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2019/24] | PAGING METHOD AND PAGING DEVICE | ||
Former [2019/24] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RADIORECHERCHE | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2019 | Translation filed | 08.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 11.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2022 | 15.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | IT | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/16] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011162667 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8, line 6 - page 15, line 3 *; | [XI]WO2014013057 (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE]) [X] 1,6,11 * page 5, line 29 - line 34 * * page 15, line 22 - page 18, line 16 * [I] 2-5,7-10,12-15; | [XI] - NOKIA ET AL, "Paging for light connection", vol. RAN WG3, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-161352_LIGHTCONNECTEDPAGING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20160522), XP051106150 [X] 1,5,6,10,11,15 * Subsections 2.1, 2.3, 2.4 * [I] 2-4,7-9,12-14 | [A] - CHINA UNICOM, "RAN-based paging for light connection", vol. RAN WG2, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-163803 RAN-BASED PAGING FOR LIGHT CONNECTION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160522), XP051105209 [A] 1-15 * Section 2 * | International search | [X]US2008025250 (WANG HUAI Y [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 7, 17-20, 23* , description, paragraphs [0022]-[0027] *; | [XY]CN102202394 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-4, 7, 17-20, 23 * , description, paragraphs [0063]-[0071], the same as above * [Y] 5, 6, 8-10, 21, 22, 24-26; | [XY]CN103813358 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 11-16, 27-32 * , description, paragraphs [0075]-[0083], the same as above * [Y] 5, 6, 8-10, 21, 22, 24-26 |