EP3501430 - ATRIAL APPENDAGE CLIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Med Zenith Medical Scientific Co., Ltd. No.5 2nd Zhuyuan Street Tianzhu Free Trade Zone Shunyi District Beijing 101312 / CN | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jinshan No. 5, 2nd Zhuyuan Street Tianzhu Free Trade, Shunyi District / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Qingliang No. 5, 2nd Zhuyuan Street Tianzhu Free Trade, Shunyi District / CN | 03 /
KE, Danian No. 5, 2nd Zhuyuan Street Tianzhu Free Trade, Shunyi District / CN | 04 /
MENG, Jian No. 5, 2nd Zhuyuan Street Tianzhu Free Trade, Shunyi District / CN | 05 /
LIU, Xiaofang No. 5, 2nd Zhuyuan Street Tianzhu Free Trade, Shunyi District / CN | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 16913443.4 | 29.12.2016 | [2019/26] | WO2016CN112823 | Priority number, date | CN201610676751 | 16.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610676751 | [2019/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018032691 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501430 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/122, A61B17/128, A61B17/12 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/122 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/00234 (CN);
A61B17/1227 (EP,US);
A61B17/12013 (EP);
A61B17/128 (EP);
A61B17/1285 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | A61B17/122 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | HERZOHRCLIP | [2019/26] | English: | ATRIAL APPENDAGE CLIP | [2019/26] | French: | ATTACHE D'OCCLUSION D'APPENDICE AURICULAIRE | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2019 | Translation filed | 07.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 03.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1600108 (IDX MEDICAL LTD [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074]; figures 2A-C *; | [A]US2008039879 (CHIN ALBERT K [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0155] - paragraph [0159]; figures 8A-C *; | [A]US2008208324 (GLITHERO JASON I [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 5-6 *; | [A]US2012035631 (HUGHETT SR JAMES DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0032]; figures 1, 18A-D * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0071] *; | [A]US2012035622 (KISER ANDY CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0123]; figures 8A-E *; | [A]US2013190777 (HUGHETT SR JAMES DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-11* figures 1, 29-43 *; | [A]CN105193471 (BEIJING MAIDI DINGFENG MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067]; figures 2A-3 * |