EP3496535 - COMPOSITION, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR TREATING WATER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCH Corporation 2727 Chemsearch Blvd. Irving, Texas 75062 / US | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENVIR, Adrian 800 Firestone Ln. Richardson, TX 75080 / US | 02 /
EDFORD, James Gregory 2903 Willow Park St. Richland Hills, TX 76118 / US | 03 /
DELEGARD, Angela L. 1508 Angelina Bend Dr. Denton, TX 76205 / US | 04 /
BOYETTE, Scott M. 2132 Shumard Oak Ln. Irving, TX 75063 / US | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 16913627.2 | 05.10.2016 | [2019/25] | WO2016US55546 | Priority number, date | US201615237052 | 15.08.2016 Original published format: US201615237052 | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018034683 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496535 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/36, B08B7/04, C02F1/00, C02F5/08, C02F11/14, B01D61/12 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
B01D65/02 (EP,IL);
A01N25/00 (IL);
A01N37/36 (EP,IL);
A01P1/00 (EP);
B01D61/12 (EP,IL);
B01D2321/162 (EP,IL);
B01D2321/164 (EP,IL);
B01D2321/167 (EP);
B01D2321/168 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A01N37/36, A01N59/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WASSERSYSTEMEN | [2019/25] | English: | COMPOSITION, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR TREATING WATER SYSTEMS | [2019/25] | French: | COMPOSITION, SYSTÈME, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE CIRCUITS D'EAU | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 26.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 01.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/30] | Divisional application(s) | EP21173378.7 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014155147 (NCH CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0012] * * claims 1-42 * [I] 1-15; | [XI]US2015126425 (HENDERSON ECATERINA [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0029] * * claims 1-41 * [I] 1-15; | [XI]WO2015069684 (NCH CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * claims 1-41 *[I] 1-15 | International search | [Y]US3123554 (MURRAY. WB) [Y] 4, 12, 20, 28 * : column 2 lines 25-35 *; | [A]US2004007255 (LABIB MOHAMED EMAM [US], et al) [A] 1-33* ; entire document *; | [A]WO2013090569 (SOANE ENERGY LLC [US]) [A] 1-33 * ; entire document *; | [Y]WO2013163146 (AQUATECH INT CORP [US]) [Y] 22-30 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0009], [0028], [0030], [0037]-[0040], [0048] *; | [A]US2014263075 (MADSEN DANE H [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * ; entire document *; | [XY]WO2014155147 (NCH CORP [US]) [X] 1-3, 5-11, 13-19, 21, 31-33 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0012]-[0013], [0016], [0018], [0020], [0024], [0027], [0032]-[0033], [0037], [0040], [0047]; claims 1- * [Y] 4, 12, 20, 22-30 |