EP3507144 - A VEHICLE ANTI-THEFT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARDCORE AUTOMOTIVE LOCKING TECHNOLOGIES (PTY) LTD Jolin House Cnr of Marloth & van der Merwe Street 1200 Nelspruit / ZA | [2023/31] |
Former [2019/28] | For all designated states Hardcore Automotive Locking Technologies (pty) Ltd Jolin House Cnr Marloth&van der Merwe Streets 1200 Nelspruit / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TALJAARD, Philippus Petrus Erasmus 11 Cecilia Street 1200 Nelspruit / ZA | [2023/31] |
Former [2019/28] | 01 /
TALJAARD, Philippus, Petrus, Erasmus 11 Cecilia Street 1200 Nelspruit / ZA | Representative(s) | Cremer & Cremer Patentanwälte St.-Barbara-Straße 16 89077 Ulm / DE | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 16915022.4 | 12.12.2016 | [2019/28] | WO2016IB57538 | Priority number, date | ZA20160006093 | 02.09.2016 Original published format: ZA 201606093 | ZA20160006693 | 28.09.2016 Original published format: ZA 201606693 | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018042236 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507144 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3507144 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/24, F16H63/34 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
B60R25/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60R25/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60K28/10 (US);
B60K28/165 (KR);
B60R16/023 (KR);
B60R16/033 (KR);
B60R25/10 (KR,US);
B60R25/20 (EP,KR,US);
B60R25/24 (KR,US);
B60R25/243 (EP,KR);
B60R25/25 (KR,US);
B60R25/32 (KR,US);
B60R25/33 (KR,US);
B60R25/34 (KR);
B60R25/403 (KR,US);
E05B79/04 (US);
F16H63/3416 (EP,KR);
F16H63/3458 (EP,KR);
F16H63/48 (EP,KR);
B60R2025/0415 (EP,KR,US);
B60R2325/10 (KR,US);
B60R2325/101 (KR,US);
B60R2325/105 (KR,US);
B60R2325/205 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/28] | B60R25/04, B60R25/06, B60R25/20, B60R25/30, B60K28/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | DIEBSTAHLSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2019/28] | English: | A VEHICLE ANTI-THEFT DEVICE | [2019/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTIVOL DE VÉHICULE | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2019/28] | 25.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 17.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 25.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 25.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2020 | 31.12.2021 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | MC | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | LU | 12.12.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SK | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1363676 (AUGUST SCHWEMMER) [Y] 2,4,5,7,10-12,14 * page 1, lines 67-106 * * figures 1-3 *; | [AD]US1668395 (CARPENTER FRANK D) [AD] 1-16 * page 1, lines 1-20 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US1687475 (GILLENWATERS FRANK M) [A] 1-16 * page 1, lines 1-25 * * figures 1-5 *; | [AD]US2992693 (PEYTON HARVEY E F) [AD] 1-16 * column 1, lines 12-35 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5020344 (GARCIA GERVASIO B [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [XYI]DE102004060817 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,9,13,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0008] , [0011] , [0023] , [0024] * [Y] 2,4,5,7,10-12,14 [I] 3,6,8,15; | [A]KR20120076830 (IL HEUNG CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16* abstract * | International search | [A]US5714807 (ALBANES PEDRO [US]) [A] 1-4* ; entire document *; | [X]WO2008007371 (SHNIDER HAIM [IL], et al) [X] 1-4 * ; page 7, line 1 to page 12, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]US2012041647 (VUJASINOVIC MIRKO [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * ; entire document * | by applicant | US1363676 | US1476437 | US1668395 | US2992693 | DE102004060817 | US2011193692 | US8006526 |