EP3507654 - PARTIALLY DRIED INKJET MEDIA CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Steve O. 1115 SE 164th Avenue Columbia Center Suite 210 Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 02 /
LO, Kevin 1115 SE 164th Avenue Columbia Center Suite 210 Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 03 /
BRINKLY, Richard Lee 1115 SE 164th Avenue Columbia Center Suite 210 Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 04 /
MACKENZIE, Mark H. 1115 SE 164th Avenue Columbia Center Suite 210 Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16915397.0 | 02.09.2016 | [2019/28] | WO2016US50199 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018044324 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507654 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/00 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
B41J11/002 (EP,US);
B41J11/0024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/28] | G03G15/20, B41M3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | KONDITIONIERER FÜR TEILWEISE GETROCKNETE TINTENSTRAHLMEDIEN | [2019/28] | English: | PARTIALLY DRIED INKJET MEDIA CONDITIONER | [2019/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE MILIEUX DE JET D'ENCRE PARTIELLEMENT SÉCHÉS | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 21.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 10.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003137572 (MIYAMOTO FUJIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 19] , [0 20] , [0 37] - [0046] - [0 62] - [0065] - [0 73] - [0077] - [0 94] , [0 95]; figures 1, 3, 4, 6, 7, 10; claims 1-32 *; | [X]US2002027587 (SUGAYA TOYOAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 7] , [ 180] - [0186] - [ 348] - [0355]; figures 1, 36; claims 1-32 *; | [X]US2009315926 (YAMANOBE JUN [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 156] , [ 157] , [ 165] , [ 166] , [ 190] , [ 191]; figure 1; claims 1-14 * | International search | [X]US2015234332 (GOTODA KATSUHIKO [TW]) [X] 1-15 * , fig. 2, paragraphs 3, 19, 20, fig. 2, position 31, 32, abstract * |