EP3510356 - INDOOR NAVIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHU, Yuanchao c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 02 /
KARLSSON, Börje Felipe Fernandes c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 03 /
MOSCIBRODA, Thomas c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Yundie c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 05 /
LI, Zhuqi c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 16915444.0 | 07.09.2016 | [2019/29] | WO2016CN98316 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018045508 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3510356 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
G01C21/206 (EP,US);
G01C21/14 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/29] | G01C21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Title | German: | INNENRAUMNAVIGATION | [2019/29] | English: | INDOOR NAVIGATION | [2019/29] | French: | NAVIGATION INTÉRIEURE | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 22.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2024 | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 10.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010268454 (FOUNTAIN JONATHAN WILLIAM [GB]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 1-14 * * paragraphs [0003] , [00 5] - [0007] - [0026] , [0031] - [0039] - [0044] , [0045] , [0049] - [0051] ** claims 1-20 *; | [X]US2010318293 (BRUSH ALICE JANE [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 1-13 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0021] , [0023] , [0025] , [0026] , [0041] , [0046] - [0049] - [0051] - [0056] - [0075] , [0076] * * claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO2015065418 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * page 1, lines 3-16 * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 24 * * page 5, lines 24-31 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 10 * * page 13, line 9 - page 14, line 17 * * claims 1-25 *; | [X]US2015160018 (AMELING MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0016] - [0018] - [0024] - [0030] - [0040] , [0042] - [0048] * * claims 1-20 *; | [X]US2016223340 (SHIN KANG G [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-20B * * paragraphs [0047] , [0052] , [0058] , [0064] , [0069] - [0077] - [0086] - [0088] - [0104] * * claims 1-19 * | International search | [X]CN105318868 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-20 * description paragraphs 0002, 0028-0078 *; | [A]CN102484767 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103900582 (SHANGHAI PATEO YUEZHEN ELECT) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN104949675 (SHANGHAI DROI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009005018 (FORSTALL SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | CN105318868 |