EP3510615 - WIRELESS ELECTRICAL FEEDTHROUGH WETMATE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC Technologies, Inc. 11740 Katy Fwy Houston, Texas 77079 / US | [2021/39] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states FMC Technologies, Inc. 5875 North Sam Houston Parkway West Houston, TX 77086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHY, Richard, M. 14323 Mopan Springs Lane Houston, TX 77044 / US | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 16915850.8 | 07.09.2016 | [2019/29] | WO2016US50544 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018048396 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3510615 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3510615 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/02, H01F38/14, E21B47/13, H01R13/523, E21B33/038 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
H01F38/14 (EP,US);
E21B17/0283 (EP,US);
E21B41/0085 (US);
E21B47/12 (US);
H01R13/523 (EP);
H02J50/10 (US);
H04B5/24 (US);
H04B5/48 (US);
H04B5/70 (US);
H01F2038/143 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/29] | H01F38/14, E21B47/13, H01R13/523 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WETMATE-VERBINDER FÜR DRAHTLOSE ELEKTRISCHE DURCHFÜHRUNG | [2019/29] | English: | WIRELESS ELECTRICAL FEEDTHROUGH WETMATE CONNECTOR | [2019/29] | French: | CONNECTEUR ÉTANCHE DE TRAVERSÉE ÉLECTRIQUE SANS FIL | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 21.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 08.04.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2016 | AL | 20.10.2021 | AT | 20.10.2021 | CY | 20.10.2021 | CZ | 20.10.2021 | DK | 20.10.2021 | EE | 20.10.2021 | ES | 20.10.2021 | FI | 20.10.2021 | HR | 20.10.2021 | LT | 20.10.2021 | LV | 20.10.2021 | MC | 20.10.2021 | MK | 20.10.2021 | NL | 20.10.2021 | PL | 20.10.2021 | RO | 20.10.2021 | RS | 20.10.2021 | SE | 20.10.2021 | SI | 20.10.2021 | SK | 20.10.2021 | SM | 20.10.2021 | TR | 20.10.2021 | BG | 20.01.2022 | GR | 21.01.2022 | IS | 20.02.2022 | PT | 21.02.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 07.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 07.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 20.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012175969 (MAUGHAN THOMAS G [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0024] - [0069]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2013321223 (BOKENFOHR MARK [NO], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XA]US2016069178 (MULHOLLAND JOHN J [NO], et al) [X] 17-20 * paragraphs [0040] - [0068] * * figures 1-11 * [A] 1-16 | International search | [Y]US2012175969 (MAUGHAN THOMAS G [US], et al) [Y] 1-13, 20, 24-26 * , entire document especially (Figs 1-2; paras [0009], [0011], [0024] *; | [Y]US2013321223 (BOKENFOHR MARK [NO], et al) [Y] 1-26* , entire document especially Figs 4-6; paras [0014], [0075] *; | [XY]US2016069178 (MULHOLLAND JOHN J [NO], et al) [X] 27-30 * , entire document: especially Fig 2; paras [0040]-[0045], [0053] * [Y] 8-26 |