EP3518285 - MEMORY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSHIBA MEMORY CORPORATION 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Mikihiko c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
KOYANAGI, Masaru c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
NAKATANI, Masafumi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIHARA, Masahiro c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 05 /
OKUNO, Shinya c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 06 /
NAGASAKA, Shigeki c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 16916802.8 | 23.09.2016 | [2019/31] | WO2016JP78046 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018055734 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3518285 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/10, G11C5/04, G11C5/14 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
G11C5/04 (EP);
H01L25/0657 (EP,US);
G11C16/08 (US);
G11C16/10 (US);
G11C16/12 (US);
G11C16/14 (US);
G11C16/26 (US);
G11C16/30 (EP,US);
G11C16/32 (US);
G11C16/3404 (US);
G11C5/14 (EP);
G11C5/145 (EP);
H10B43/35 (US);
G11C16/0483 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP);
H01L2224/05548 (EP);
H01L2224/0557 (EP);
H01L2224/13025 (EP);
H01L2224/16146 (EP);
H01L2224/16227 (EP);
H01L2224/1703 (EP);
H01L2224/17181 (EP);
H01L2225/06513 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06517 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/31] | H01L27/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Title | German: | SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2019/31] | English: | MEMORY DEVICE | [2019/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MÉMOIRE | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2019 | Translation filed | 08.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 26.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006145301 (SAITO HIDEAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008150359 (YAMADA JUNJI [JP]); | [A]US2012063234 (SHIGA HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2016148907 (SEGAWA MACHIO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2001222474 (IBM); | [A]JP2002305283 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006190761 (NEC CORP, et al); | [A]JP2007250561 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY); | [YA]JP2008159736 (ELPIDA MEMORY INC); | [X]JP2012058860 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2014022652 (ELPIDA MEMORY INC) | by applicant | JP2009003991 | JP4791924B | US20090406524 | US20090407403 | US20090532030 | US20100679991 |