EP3363539 - METHOD FOR PREPARING MOLECULAR SIEVE-MULTIELEMENT OXIDE COMPOSITE INTEGRALLY EXTRUDED DENITRATION CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valiant Co., Ltd. No.11 Wuzhishan Road Yeda Yantai Yantai, Shandong 264006 / CN | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Li No.11 Wuzhishan Road YEDA Yantai Yantai Shandong 264006 / CN | 02 /
XU, Yongzhen No.11 Wuzhishan Road YEDA Yantai Yantai Shandong 264006 / CN | 03 /
LI, Quansheng No.11 Wuzhishan Road YEDA Yantai Yantai Shandong 264006 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Xiaoling No.11 Wuzhishan Road YEDA Yantai Yantai Shandong 264006 / CN | 05 /
HU, Baohua No.11 Wuzhishan Road YEDA Yantai Yantai Shandong 264006 / CN | 06 /
CUI, Ming No.11 Wuzhishan Road YEDA Yantai Yantai Shandong 264006 / CN | 07 /
TANG, Yingjie No.11 Wuzhishan Road YEDA Yantai Yantai Shandong 264006 / CN | 08 /
WANG, Yuchang No.11 Wuzhishan Road YEDA Yantai Yantai Shandong 264006 / CN | 09 /
ZHOU, Zhenlei No.11 Wuzhishan Road YEDA Yantai Yantai Shandong 264006 / CN | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Rössler, Matthias, et al Karo IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Steinstraße 16-18 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | Rössler, Matthias, et al karo IP Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels PartG mbB Postfach 32 01 02 40416 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2018/34] | Rössler, Matthias, et al Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels Patentanwälte PartG mbB (Karo IP Professionals) Postfach 32 01 02 40416 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16918110.4 | 27.12.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016CN112491 | Priority number, date | CN201611209429 | 23.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611209429 | [2018/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018113004 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3363539 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3363539 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/46, B01J29/24, B01J29/78, B01J29/85, B01J37/00, B01D53/86, B01D53/56, B01J23/00, B01J29/76, B01J29/80, B01J29/70, B01J29/16, B01J29/072, B01J29/076, B01J29/83, B01J35/04, B01J35/06, B01J37/08, B01J37/03, B01D53/94, // B01J35/02 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
B01J29/24 (EP,CN,US);
B01J29/46 (EP,CN,US);
B01D53/8628 (EP,CN,US);
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B01J29/072 (EP,US);
B01J29/076 (EP,US);
B01J29/143 (US);
B01J29/146 (US);
B01J29/166 (EP,US);
B01J29/26 (US);
B01J29/48 (EP,US);
B01J29/7065 (EP,US);
B01J29/76 (EP,US);
B01J29/7615 (EP,US);
B01J29/763 (EP,US);
B01J29/78 (EP,CN,US);
B01J29/7815 (EP,US);
B01J29/783 (EP,US);
B01J29/80 (EP,US);
B01J29/83 (EP,US);
B01J29/85 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J35/58 (EP,US);
B01J37/00 (CN);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
B01J37/0018 (EP,US);
B01J37/0036 (EP,US);
B01J37/0045 (EP,US);
B01J37/009 (EP,US);
B01J37/03 (EP,US);
B01J37/04 (US);
B01J37/06 (EP,US);
B01J37/088 (EP,US);
B01J37/30 (US);
B01D2255/2065 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2073 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20746 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20753 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/50 (EP,US);
B01D2255/502 (US);
B01D2255/504 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0283 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2229/186 (EP,US);
B01J2229/20 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/23, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/69, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/68 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/69, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/68 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/23, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/72 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/72 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/68 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/72 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/69 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/69, B01J2523/72 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/69, B01J2523/842 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/33, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/43, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/845, B01J2523/847 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/33, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/43, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/845, B01J2523/847 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/842 (US,EP) (-) |
Former IPC [2018/34] | B01J29/46, B01J29/24, B01J29/78, B01J29/85, B01J37/00, B01D53/86, B01D53/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES EINSTÜCKIG EXTRUDIERTEN MOLEKULARSIEB-MULTIELEMENTOXIDVERBUNDDENITRIERUNGSKATALYSATORS | [2022/37] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING MOLECULAR SIEVE-MULTIELEMENT OXIDE COMPOSITE INTEGRALLY EXTRUDED DENITRATION CATALYST | [2018/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN CATALYSEUR DE DÉNITRATION COMPRENANT UN COMPOSITE D'OXYDE MULTI-ÉLÉMENTS ET UN TAMIS MOLÉCULAIRE | [2022/37] |
Former [2018/34] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRTEILIGEN, EINSTÜCKIG EXTRUDIERTEN MOLEKULARSIEB-OXIDVERBUNDDENITRIERUNGSKATALYSATORS | ||
Former [2018/34] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN CATALYSEUR DE DÉNITRATION COMPOSITE D'OXYDE MULTI-ÉLÉMENTS À TAMIS MOLÉCULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2018 | Translation filed | 13.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 13.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.12.2016 | AL | 14.12.2022 | AT | 14.12.2022 | BG | 14.12.2022 | CY | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | ES | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | IT | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | MK | 14.12.2022 | MT | 14.12.2022 | NL | 14.12.2022 | PL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | IE | 27.12.2022 | LU | 27.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | NO | 14.03.2023 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 27.12.2016 | |
AL | 14.12.2022 | ||
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
BG | 14.12.2022 | ||
CY | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
MK | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IE | 27.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 27.12.2016 | |
AL | 14.12.2022 | ||
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CY | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
MK | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IE | 27.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 27.12.2016 | |
AL | 14.12.2022 | ||
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CY | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IE | 27.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 27.12.2016 | |
AL | 14.12.2022 | ||
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CY | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IE | 27.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.12.2016 | |
AL | 14.12.2022 | ||
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IE | 27.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IE | 27.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IE | 27.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
IE | 27.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | |
NO | 14.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2493449 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]); | [A]CN105562077 (WUXI WEIFU ENV PROT CATALYST CO LTD) |