EP3528327 - BIPOLAR PLATE, CELL FRAME, CELL STACK, AND REDOX FLOW CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANNO, Takashi c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 02 /
MOTOI, Kenji c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/29] |
Former [2019/34] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 16918514.7 | 12.10.2016 | [2019/34] | WO2016JP80270 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018069996 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528327 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3528327 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/18, H01M8/02, H01M8/0247, H01M8/24 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
H01M8/0247 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/026 (KR);
H01M8/0265 (KR);
H01M8/0267 (US);
H01M8/0273 (KR);
H01M8/188 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | H01M8/18, H01M8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIPOLARE PLATTE, ZELLENRAHMEN, ZELLENSTAPEL UND REDOX-DURCHFLUSSBATTERIE | [2019/34] | English: | BIPOLAR PLATE, CELL FRAME, CELL STACK, AND REDOX FLOW CELL | [2019/34] | French: | PLAQUE BIPOLAIRE, CHÂSSIS DE CELLULE, EMPILEMENT DE CELLULES ET BATTERIE À FLUX RÉDOX | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2018 | Translation filed | 12.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.06.2018 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 18.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2023 | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | IT | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | MC | 19.07.2023 | NL | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | LU | 12.10.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | [2024/30] |
Former [2024/28] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 19.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2011112520 (BDF IP HOLDINGS LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9-12 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 30 * * page 8, line 10 - page 10, line 18; examples 1-5 * [Y] 4,6-8; | WO2013095378 [ ] (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al); | [XY]JP2015505147 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [X] 1-3,5,9-12 * the whole document * [Y] 4,6-8 | International search | [A]WO2014167306 (ACAL ENERGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * , & GB 2515994 A *; | [X]JP2015505147 (United Technologies Corp.) [X] 1-12 * , claims 1, 7; paragraphs [0028] to [0030]; fig. 5 & WO 2013/095378 A1 claims 1, 7; paragraphs [0038] to [0040]; fig. 5A, 5B & US 2015/0263358 A1 & EP 2795697 A1 & CN 103988340 A & KR 10-2014-0084247 A *; | [A]WO2015162954 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-12* , & JP 2015-210849 A * | by applicant | JP2015122230 | JP2015122231 | JP2015138771 | JP2015210849 |