EP3528517 - DATA PACKET PROCESSING METHOD, CONTROL PLANE NETWORK ELEMENT AND USER PLANE NETWORK ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Runze Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
NIE, Shengxian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Zhongping Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 16920838.6 | 04.11.2016 | [2019/34] | WO2016CN104786 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018082070 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528517 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3528517 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/12, // H04W88/16, H04W92/24, H04W28/10 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
H04W76/12 (EP,US);
H04W8/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/22 (US);
H04L47/20 (KR);
H04W12/033 (KR);
H04W28/10 (EP);
H04W76/11 (EP);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W88/16 (EP,US);
H04W92/24 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | H04W8/14, H04W76/12, // H04W88/16, H04W92/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENPAKETVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, STEUEREBENENNETZELEMENT UND BENUTZEREBENENNETZELEMENT | [2019/34] | English: | DATA PACKET PROCESSING METHOD, CONTROL PLANE NETWORK ELEMENT AND USER PLANE NETWORK ELEMENT | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE PAQUETS DE DONNÉES, ÉLÉMENT DE RÉSEAU DE PLAN DE COMMANDE ET ÉLÉMENT DE RÉSEAU DE PLAN D'UTILISATEUR | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2019 | Translation filed | 16.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 23.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Interface between the Control Plane and the User Plane of EPC Nodes; Stage 3 (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 29.244, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20161027), vol. CT WG4, no. V0.2.0, pages 1 - 26, XP051173172 [X] 1-15 * sections 5.2, 5.3, 6.3.2 and 7 * | [ ] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Architecture enhancements for control and user plane separation of EPC nodes; Stage 2 (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.214, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20160914), vol. SA WG2, no. V0.2.0, pages 1 - 66, XP051172439 [ ] * sections 4.3, 4.4, 5.6, 5.9 and 6.3 * | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Architecture enhancements for control and user plane separation of EPC nodes; Stage 2 (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.214, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20160914), vol. SA WG2, no. V0.2.0, pages 1 - 66, XP051172439 [X] 1-15 * sections 4.3, 4.4, 5.6, 5.9 and 6.3 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on control and user plane separation of EPC nodes (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD ; TECHNICAL REPORT ; 3GPP TR 23.714, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20160622), vol. SA WG2, no. V14.0.0, pages 1 - 87, XP051295181 [A] 1-15 * sections 6.1.1.10, 6.1.1.13, * | [A] - NOKIA, "Packet Forwarding Model for CUPS", (20161017), 3GPP DRAFT; C4-165071, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/CT4/Docs/, (20161017), XP051146337 [A] 1-15 * slides 3-14 * |