EP3514390 - COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Sung Hea 65 Docheong-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16509 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Yang Sun 110 Anyang-ro Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14035 / KR | 03 /
SEO, Jong Cheun 111 Yeongtong-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16687 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Tae Yoon 72 Gwonseon-ro 908beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16682 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Tae Hoon 50-15 Maetan-ro 140beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16544 / KR | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 16920933.5 | 16.11.2016 | [2019/30] | WO2016KR13217 | Priority number, date | KR20160149613 | 10.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160149613 | [2019/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018088605 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3514390 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3514390 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/02, F04C29/12, F04C29/06, F16K15/02 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C18/0223 (KR,US);
F04C18/0253 (US);
F04C29/06 (KR,US);
F04C29/124 (KR,US);
F04C29/126 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/30] | F04C18/02, F04C29/12, F04C29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDICHTER | [2019/30] | English: | COMPRESSOR | [2019/30] | French: | COMPRESSEUR | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2019 | Translation filed | 18.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 03.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | CZ | 24.05.2023 | DK | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | ES | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | IT | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SE | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
PT | 25.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3530880 (HUNE RONALD G) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [XI]US5452989 (ROOD JERRY A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11,14 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 20; figures 2,4,5 * [I] 5-10,12,13; | [A]US2006177336 (HWANG SEON-WOONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060]; figures 7a,7b * | International search | [A]KR100223432B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14* See abstract, claim 1 and figures 4-6c. *; | [A]KR100291990B (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-14 * See abstract, claim 1 and figure 5. *; | [XY]US6457952 (HALLER DAVID K [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 11-14 * See abstract, column 3, tine 36-column 6, line 20 and figures 1-4. * [Y] 5-10; | [A]JP2003172274 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-14 * See abstract, paragraphs [0017]-[0023] and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]JP2004044502 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [Y] 5-10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0015]-[0024] and figures 1-2, 4, 6. * |