EP3539418 - MULTI-SIDED VIBRATING AND CLEANSING TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states An, Taek Ho 501dong 2103ho 315-1 Yeoksam-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06213 / KR | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Danubia Patent & Law Office LLC Bajcsy-Zsilinszky út 16 1051 Budapest / HU | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 16921308.9 | 25.11.2016 | [2019/38] | WO2016KR13736 | Priority number, date | KR20160151439 | 14.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160151439 | [2019/38] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018088613 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3539418 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A46B13/02, A46B9/04, A46B9/02 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
A46B9/028 (EP,KR,US);
A46B13/023 (EP,KR,US);
A46B9/045 (EP,US);
A46B9/025 (EP);
A46B9/026 (EP);
A46B9/04 (KR);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Title | German: | MEHRSEITIGE VIBRIERENDEN UND REINIGENDE ZAHNBÜRSTE | [2019/38] | English: | MULTI-SIDED VIBRATING AND CLEANSING TOOTHBRUSH | [2019/38] | French: | BROSSE À DENTS À PLUSIEURS CÔTÉS NETTOYANTE ET VIBRANTE | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2019 | Translation filed | 14.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 04.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/28] | 26.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 14.06.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]KR20140134081 (LIM JAE HOON [KR]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-3, para. 17-30 of the machine translation * [A] 3-6; | [XAI]US2009276972 (DUGAN DAVID M [US]) [X] 1 * para. 35-38, 40-50, figures 1-12 * [A] 3-6 [I] 2; | [XAI]US1894509 (BOOTH DAVID N) [X] 1 * figures 1-14, in particular figures 2-5 * [A] 3-6 [I] 2; | [IA]WO2012165686 (HA MYOUNG HOON [KR]) [I] 1,2 * figures 2-7, machine translation * [A] 3-6 | International search | [XYA]US2009229062 (FILBY ELIZABETH [US]) [X] 1 * See claims 1-3; paragraphs [0021]-[0024]; figures 1-3. * [Y] 2 [A] 3-6; | [Y]KR20120133420 (HA, Myoung Hoon) [Y] 2 * See claims 4-5; figure 3. *; | [A]KR101592857B (LEE YUN JEONG [KR]) [A] 1-6 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20120082905 (LIANGCO MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-6 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR100983504B (HONG HYUNG PYO [KR]) [A] 1-6 * See the entire document. *; | [A]US2010062397 (BREWER GERALD K [US]) [A] 1-6 * See the entire document. * |