EP3544104 - CELL FRAME, CELL STACK, AND REDOX FLOW BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANNO, Takashi c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 16921597.7 | 16.11.2016 | [2019/39] | WO2016JP83982 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018092216 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3544104 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/18, H01M8/02, H01M8/026, H01M8/0273, H01M8/04186, H01M8/04276 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
H01M8/188 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/026 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0273 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04186 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04276 (EP,US);
H01M8/2455 (KR,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | H01M8/18, H01M8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLRAHMEN, ZELLENSTAPEL UND REDOXDURCHFLUSSBATTERIE | [2019/39] | English: | CELL FRAME, CELL STACK, AND REDOX FLOW BATTERY | [2019/39] | French: | CHÂSSIS DE CELLULES, EMPILEMENT DE CELLULES, ET BATTERIE À FLUX REDOX | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2018 | Translation filed | 13.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 20.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2016072254 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,7,8 * page 12, paragraph 5 - page 14, paragraph 3; claims 1-5 * [Y] 2-6; | [XY]JP2015210849 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2-6 | International search | [A]JP2013518362 (Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd.) [A] 1-8 * , & US 2012/0308911 A1 & WO 2011/089516 A2 & CN 102725893 A & KR 10-2012-0130177 A *; | [A]JP2015210849 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8 * , & WO 2015/162954 A1 & CN 106165176 A *; | [A]WO2016104613 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , (Family: none) * |