EP3561570 - HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY APPARATUS, AND VISUAL-AID PROVIDING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Royole Technologies Co., Ltd. A4-1501 Kexing Science Park No. 15 Keyuan Rd. Science and Technology Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Cong A4-1501 Kexing Science Park No.15 Keyuan Rd. Science and Technology Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16924452.2 | 22.12.2016 | [2019/44] | WO2016CN111510 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018112838 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3561570 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
G02B27/017 (EP,CN);
H04N5/262 (CN);
G09G5/005 (US);
G06F3/011 (US);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N23/60 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/63 (EP);
H04N23/6812 (EP);
H04N5/2624 (EP);
H04N5/2628 (EP,CN);
H04N5/265 (CN,US);
H04N7/18 (CN);
H04N7/183 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP);
G02B2027/0187 (EP);
G09G2354/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER SEHHILFE DAFÜR | [2019/44] | English: | HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY APPARATUS, AND VISUAL-AID PROVIDING METHOD THEREOF | [2019/44] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE TÊTE HAUTE, ET PROCÉDÉ PROCURANT UNE AIDE VISUELLE DE CELUI-CI | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2019 | Translation filed | 03.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 12.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |