EP3240227 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TAMPER-PROOF PROVISION OF A KEY CERTIFICATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states III Holdings 12, LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busser, Jens-Uwe Lilienthalstr. 28 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 02 /
Fries, Steffen Eberweg 3 85598 Baldham / DE | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 17000064.0 | 22.07.2011 | [2017/44] | Priority number, date | DE20101033231 | 03.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010033231 | [2017/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3240227 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3240227 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L9/08 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
H04L9/3228 (EP,US);
H04L9/32 (US);
H04L9/08 (US);
H04L9/3263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2017/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MANIPULATIONSSICHEREN BEREITSTELLUNG EINES SCHLÜSSEL-ZERTIFIKATES | [2017/44] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TAMPER-PROOF PROVISION OF A KEY CERTIFICATE | [2017/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FOURNITURE D'UN CERTIFICAT CODÉ PROTÉGÉ CONTRE TOUTE MANIPULATION | [2017/44] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 13.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11740617.3 / EP2567503 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2011 | AL | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | ES | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | IT | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | NL | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IE | 22.07.2020 | LU | 22.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.07.2011 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5825300 (BATHRICK ERWIN W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004158708 (PEYRAVIAN MOHAMMAD [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0013] - [0032]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102005009867 (DEUTSCHER SPARKASSEN VERLAG GM [DE]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0004] - [0017] * |