blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3205334

EP3205334 - METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR TREATING OCULAR HYPERTENSION AND GLAUCOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  26.03.2025
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.03.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.03.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2025Revocation of patentpublished on 30.04.2025  [2025/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Santen Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome
Higashiyodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 533-8651 / JP
For all designated states
AGC Inc.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
[2018/39]
Former [2017/33]For all designated states
Santen Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome
Higashiyodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 533-8651 / JP
For all designated states
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / REUNAMAKI, Timo
Jakalakatu 4
33820 Tampere / FI
02 / PELLINEN, Pertti
Simunantie 12C7
33880 Lempaala / FI
03 / OKSALA, Olli
Hirvikatu 24 E 20
33240 Tampere / FI
04 / LEHMUSSAARI, Kari
Silakatu 3
33580 Tampere / FI
 [2017/33]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2017/33]
Application number, filing date17000440.228.05.2009
[2017/33]
Priority number, dateEP2008039751330.05.2008         Original published format: EP 08397513
[2017/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3205334
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3205334
Date:29.04.2020
Language:EN
[2020/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2017
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/08, A61K47/10, A61K47/26, A61K47/18, A61K31/5575
[2017/33]
CPC:
A61K9/0048 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/5575 (EP,KR,US); A61K47/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,KR,US); A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US); A61K9/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/02 (EP); A61P27/06 (EP,US); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP); A61K2800/80 (KR); A61K47/02 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/13]
Former [2017/33]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUGENHOCHDRUCK UND GLAUKOM[2017/33]
English:METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR TREATING OCULAR HYPERTENSION AND GLAUCOMA[2017/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERTENSION OCULAIRE ET DU GLAUCOME[2017/33]
Examination procedure17.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/13]
06.03.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
19.03.2020Fee for grant paid
19.03.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09754864.8  / EP2306977
EP14001862.3  / EP2772249
Divisional application(s)EP20164602.3  / EP3714877
EP21217057.5  / EP4035656
EP23202597.3  / EP4289446
EP25150453.6  / EP4512424
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.01.2021  28.01.2021  ADMISSIBLE
Cooke, Richard
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP, et al, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [2021/09]
16.02.2021Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.06.2021Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.04.2022Date of oral proceedings
02.08.2022Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.08.2022Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.02.2025Legal effect of revocation of patent [2025/18]
18.03.2025Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.10.2022Appeal received No.  T2275/22
12.10.2022Payment of appeal fee
12.12.2022Statement of grounds filed
25.02.2025Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
18.03.2025Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
11.10.2022Appeal received No.  T2275/22
11.10.2022Payment of appeal fee
01.11.2022Statement of grounds filed
25.02.2025Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
18.03.2025Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
25.02.2025Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
14.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY29.04.2020
MC29.04.2020
MK29.04.2020
MT29.04.2020
LU28.05.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/28]CY29.04.2020
MC29.04.2020
MT29.04.2020
LU28.05.2020
Former [2021/15]MC29.04.2020
LU28.05.2020
Former [2021/12]MC29.04.2020
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0003736  (ALCON LAB INC [US]);
 [Y]EP1321144  (SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [Y]EP1825855  (SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]);
by applicantUS5409125
 US5614172
 EP0850926
 US5807892
 US5886035
 EP0969846
 EP1011728
 US6096783
 US6241124
 EP1115406
 US6344477
 EP1321144
 EP1349580
 EP1547599
 EP1666043
 WO2007042262
 EP1825855
 EP1829545
 US2007248697
 EP1905453
 EP1916002
OppositionWO0003736
 EP1321144
 US2005287325
 EP1825855
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.