EP3404396 - SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING A DRIED FLUID SAMPLE SUBSTRATE, AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2018/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERUBINI, Claudio Allmendweg 4 6330 Cham / CH | 02 /
DRECHSLER, Andreas Frueebergstrasse 53 6340 Baar / CH | 03 /
HUESSER, Reto Huenenbergerstrasse 12 6330 Cham / CH | 04 /
SAROFIM, Emad Flurstrasse 14 6332 Hagendorn / CH | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/47] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17000846.0 | 17.05.2017 | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3404396 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3404396 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/04, G01N1/28, B23K26/16, // B23K37/04, B23K26/04, B23K26/08, B23K26/12, B23K26/38, B23K26/70, B23K103/00 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
B23K26/16 (EP,US);
B23K26/0853 (EP,US);
B23K26/0876 (EP,US);
B23K26/127 (EP,US);
B23K26/38 (EP,US);
B23K26/702 (EP,US);
B23K37/0408 (EP,US);
B23K37/0443 (EP,US);
G01N1/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/47] | G01N1/04, G01N1/28, B23K26/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] |
Former [2018/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINER GETROCKNETEN FLÜSSIGKEITSPROBE, SUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/47] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING A DRIED FLUID SAMPLE SUBSTRATE, AND METHOD THEREFOR | [2018/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'UN SUBSTRAT D'ÉCHANTILLON DE FLUIDE SÉCHÉ ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2018/47] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 11.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2017 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | ES | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | IT | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | NL | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | IE | 17.05.2020 | LU | 17.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.05.2017 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 17.05.2020 | ||
LU | 17.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 17.05.2020 | ||
LU | 17.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 17.05.2020 | ||
LU | 17.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 17.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007051710 (ODANAKA KENTARO [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0030] *; | [AD]WO2009068749 (WALLAC OY [FI], et al) [AD] 1,16 * figure 6 ** page 5, line 10 - line 25 *; | [IDA]US2015040688 (MURPHY SEAN C [US]) [ID] 1-3,5-7,9-13,16-20 * figures 1E,1F,2 * * paragraphs [0032] - [0033] - [0037] , [0051] - [0053] * [A] 4,8,14,15,21 | by applicant | WO2009068749 | US2015040688 |