EP3327125 - RNA INTERFERENCE MEDIATED INHIBITION OF GENE EXPRESSION USING SHORT INTERFERING NUCLEIC ACIDS (SINA) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sirna Therapeutics, Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cancilla, Mark 1700 Owens Street San Francisco, California 94158 / US | 02 /
Cunningham, James, J. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 03 /
Flanagan, W. Michael 1700 Owens Street San Francisco, California 94158 / US | 04 /
Haringsma, Henry, J. 1700 Owens Street San Francisco, California 94158 / US | 05 /
Kenski, Denise 1700 Owens Street San Francisco, California 94158 / US | 06 /
Stanton, Matthew, G. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 07 /
Stirdivant, Steven, M. 17 Bittersweet Drive Doylestown, Pennsylvania 18901 / US | 08 /
Willingham, Aarron 1700 Owens Street San Francisco, California 94158 / US | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 17001756.0 | 25.10.2011 | [2018/22] | Priority number, date | US20100408303P | 29.10.2010 Original published format: US 408303 P | US20100408428P | 29.10.2010 Original published format: US 408428 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3327125 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3327125 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (US);
C07H21/02 (EP,US);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (US);
C12N2310/3231 (EP,US);
C12N2310/331 (EP,US);
C12N2310/344 (US);
C12N2310/346 (EP,US);
C12N2310/351 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (US,EP);
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3527 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3533 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2018/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RNA-INTERFERENZ-VERMITTELTE INHIBITION VON GENEXPRESSION UNTER VERWENDUNG KURZER INTERFERIERENDER NUKLEINSÄURE (SINA) | [2018/22] | English: | RNA INTERFERENCE MEDIATED INHIBITION OF GENE EXPRESSION USING SHORT INTERFERING NUCLEIC ACIDS (SINA) | [2018/22] | French: | INHIBITION AU MOYEN D'INTERFÉRENCE ARN D'UNE EXPRESSION DE GÈNE UTILISANT DES ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES À PETIT INTERFÉRENT (SINA) | [2018/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 29.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11836946.1 / EP2632472 | Divisional application(s) | EP20189118.1 / EP3766975 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2011 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | ES | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | IT | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | LU | 25.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.10.2011 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004192626 (MCSWIGGEN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-77; tables IV,VI-VIII *; | [A]US2009306184 (MCSWIGGEN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * table IV *; | [A]WO2010111471 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 10,11 *; | [T] - H. J. HARINGSMA ET AL, "mRNA knockdown by single strand RNA is improved by chemical modifications", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20120116), vol. 40, no. 9, doi:10.1093/nar/gkr1301, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4125 - 4136, XP055108366 [T] * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr1301 | by applicant | US2789118 | US2990401 | US3048581 | US3126375 | US3749712 | US3928326 | US3929768 | US3996359 | US4231938 | US4294926 | US4319039 | US4346227 | US4410629 | US4444784 | US4501729 | US4537859 | US4681893 | US4782084 | US4820850 | US4885314 | US4911165 | EP0360390 | US4916239 | US4929437 | WO9005525 | WO9005729 | EP0394989 | EP0428434 | EP0429366 | EP0430771 | US5030447 | EP0436334 | WO9109844 | EP0443132 | WO9118899 | WO9201688 | WO9206079 | EP0482539 | US5118853 | WO9212151 | US5134142 | US5138045 | EP0498069 | EP0499313 | WO9215585 | WO9217449 | US5162339 | EP0512901 | EP0512902 | EP0514273 | EP0514274 | EP0514275 | EP0514276 | WO9220661 | WO9220676 | EP0515681 | EP0517589 | WO9221677 | WO9222569 | EP0520555 | WO9300330 | WO9300331 | EP0522808 | US5180589 | WO9301159 | WO9301165 | WO9301169 | WO9301170 | US5189164 | EP0528495 | EP0532456 | EP0533280 | WO9306099 | EP0536817 | WO9309116 | US5214136 | WO9310073 | EP0545478 | WO9314084 | WO9314113 | US5232929 | EP0558156 | US5242930 | WO9318023 | WO9319064 | WO9321155 | WO9321181 | GB2266529 | WO9323569 | WO9323380 | WO9324465 | US5273995 | EP0577394 | WO9400440 | WO9401402 | GB2268931 | GB2269170 | WO9402595 | WO9402461 | US5286634 | GB2269590 | WO9403429 | WO9403445 | US5290946 | WO9404494 | WO9404496 | EP0585913 | WO9405625 | EP0590152 | WO9407843 | GB2271774 | WO9408997 | WO9410165 | WO9410167 | WO9410168 | WO9410170 | WO9411368 | EP0599538 | WO9413639 | WO9413663 | EP0604181 | WO9414767 | WO9415932 | WO9415903 | EP0610793 | US5342952 | WO9419357 | WO9419320 | WO9419323 | US5344991 | WO9420500 | WO9421229 | EP0618221 | US5354772 | US5356896 | WO9426735 | WO9426740 | US5373003 | WO9429309 | US5380738 | EP0634402 | WO9502595 | US5387595 | WO9504040 | WO9504042 | US5393790 | WO9506645 | WO9507886 | WO9507908 | WO9508542 | WO9508549 | WO9510514 | WO9510515 | WO9510516 | US5409944 | WO9511917 | WO9511880 | WO9512612 | WO9512572 | WO9514017 | US5420245 | WO9515311 | WO9516679 | WO9517382 | WO9518124 | WO9518129 | WO9519344 | US5436265 | WO9520575 | WO9521819 | WO9522525 | WO9523798 | WO9524612 | WO9525086 | EP0675112 | WO9526338 | US5459270 | WO9528418 | US5466823 | WO9530674 | WO9530687 | WO9532987 | US5474995 | EP0686629 | WO9533744 | WO9534535 | WO9600736 | EP0693489 | EP0694535 | US5489691 | EP0696593 | GB2292144 | WO9605529 | WO9605168 | WO9605169 | WO9605181 | WO9605193 | WO9605203 | US5494926 | WO9606138 | WO9606193 | WO9606094 | US5496833 | EP0699655 | EP0699674 | WO9607649 | GB2293168 | GB2293169 | WO9610391 | WO9610390 | WO9610392 | WO9610562 | EP0707006 | US5510510 | EP0708101 | EP0709375 | EP0709376 | WO9616443 | US5523430 | EP0714891 | WO9616939 | WO9617861 | WO9618643 | US5532359 | WO9620197 | US5536752 | WO9621701 | WO9621456 | WO9621661 | WO9622278 | EP0723959 | WO9624611 | WO9624612 | US5550142 | EP0733632 | WO9629304 | WO9629317 | WO9629326 | WO9629328 | WO9630343 | WO9630017 | WO9630018 | WO9630362 | WO9630363 | WO9631111 | WO9631477 | WO9631478 | WO9631501 | WO9631214 | WO9632385 | WO9632099 | WO9633159 | US5571792 | WO9634850 | WO9634851 | WO9637489 | US5589485 | WO9700252 | WO9701553 | WO9701554 | GB2302689 | WO9703047 | WO9703050 | WO9702920 | WO9703066 | US5602098 | WO9704785 | US5604260 | WO9708144 | WO9714671 | WO9717070 | WO9717362 | WO9718206 | US5633272 | WO9718813 | WO9719084 | EP0776893 | WO9719942 | US5637699 | WO9721701 | WO9721702 | WO9723478 | WO9726246 | WO9730053 | US5661152 | WO9738665 | WO9744350 | US5698584 | US5705385 | US5710140 | WO9802436 | US5719147 | WO9828980 | WO9829119 | WO9834596 | US5861419 | WO9907409 | US5889136 | WO9931262 | WO9932619 | US5932598 | WO9954459 | US5976567 | US5981501 | WO9961631 | US5998203 | US6001311 | US6001843 | US6008400 | WO0001846 | WO0003683 | US6020343 | US6069134 | WO0044895 | WO0044914 | WO0044777 | US6111086 | WO0050032 | WO0053722 | US6120798 | WO0061186 | US6153737 | WO0129058 | WO0130768 | US6235886 | US6235310 | WO0136646 | US2001007666 | US6284781 | US6287591 | US6288237 | WO0170677 | WO0190084 | WO0198278 | US6335434 | WO0230912 | WO0236555 | US6395713 | WO0247671 | US6447796 | US2002130430 | WO02081435 | WO02081433 | WO02083064 | WO02083139 | WO02083140 | WO02083138 | WO02087541 | WO03013526 | WO03013506 | US6528631 | WO03018543 | US6534484 | WO03030989 | US2003077829 | WO03043689 | WO03046185 | WO03047518 | WO03050064 | WO03050122 | WO03049527 | WO03049679 | WO03049678 | US6586410 | US6586001 | WO03079973 | WO03084473 | WO03086404 | WO03086279 | WO03086394 | WO03086403 | WO03093252 | WO03093264 | WO03093251 | WO03093253 | US6649751 | WO03099211 | WO03105855 | WO03106417 | US6673918 | US6686463 | WO2004012669 | US2004071654 | WO2004031137 | WO2004031139 | WO2004031138 | US2004077540 | WO2004037171 | WO2004039774 | WO2004039800 | WO2004039370 | WO2004041162 | US2004102360 | US2004116432 | WO2004058148 | WO2004058700 | US2004162260 | US2004192626 | WO2004089911 | US6815432 | WO2004096131 | WO2004096129 | WO2004096135 | WO2004096130 | WO2004101538 | WO2004101539 | US6835395 | US2005008689 | WO2005014553 | US6858224 | US6858225 | WO2005017190 | WO2005018638 | WO2005019206 | WO2005019205 | WO2005018547 | US2005064595 | WO2005030731 | US2005079212 | US2005085486 | WO2005044354 | US2005118594 | US2005118253 | US2005153919 | US2005164220 | US2005175682 | US2005176776 | US2005191627 | WO2005100356 | WO2005100344 | US2005244504 | US2005255153 | US2005265961 | US6977223 | US2005287551 | US2006008909 | US2006014289 | US6989442 | US2006019912 | US2006019258 | US6995259 | US6998115 | US2006062758 | US2008020058 | US2008152661 | US7514099 | WO2009127060 | WO2010042877 | WO2010048536 | WO2010054401 | WO2010088537 | WO2010144740 | - ZAMORE et al., Cell, (20000000), vol. 101, pages 25 - 33 | - BASS, Cell, (20000000), vol. 101, page 235 | - FIRE et al., Nature, (19980000), vol. 391, page 806 | - HAMILTON et al., Science, (19990000), vol. 286, pages 950 - 951 | - LIN et al., Nature, (19990000), vol. 402, pages 128 - 129 | - SHARP, genes & Dev., (19990000), vol. 13, pages 139 - 141 | - STRAUSS, Science, (19990000), vol. 286, page 886 | - FIRE et al., Trends genet., (19990000), vol. 15, page 358 | - BEAUCAGE; IYER, Tetrahedron, (19930000), vol. 49, page 1925 | - TURNER et al., CSH Symp. Quant. Biol. LII, (19870000), pages 123 - 133 | - FRIER et al., Proc. Nat. Acad Sci. USA, (19860000), vol. 83, pages 9373 - 9377 | - TURNER et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19870000), vol. 109, pages 3783 - 3785 | - SEMPLE et al., Nat Biotechnol., (20100000), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 172 - 176 | - EMERICH, DF et al., Cell Transplant, (19990000), vol. 8, pages 47 - 58 | - BOADO, J. Pharm. Sci., (19980000), vol. 87, pages 1308 - 1315 | - TYLER et al., FEBS Lett., (19990000), vol. 421, pages 280 - 284 | - PARDRIDGE et al., PNAS USA, (19950000), vol. 92, pages 5592 - 5596 | - BOADO, Adv. Drug Delivery, (19950000), vol. 15, pages 73 - 107 | - ALDRIAN-HERRADA et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19980000), vol. 26, pages 4910 - 4916 | - TYLER et al., PNAS USA., (19990000), vol. 96, pages 7053 - 7058 | - SNYDER; GERSTEIN, Science, (20030000), vol. 300, pages 258 - 260 | - GRIFFITH-JONES et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20040000), vol. 32, pages D109 - D111 | - GRIFFITH-JONES et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20060000), vol. 34, pages D140 - D144 | - ZAMORE; HALEY, Science, (20050000), vol. 309, pages 1519 - 1524 | - VAUGHN; MARTIENSSEN, Science, (20050000), vol. 309, pages 1525 - 1526 | - BASS, Nature, (20010000), vol. 411, pages 428 - 429 | - ELBASHIR et al., Nature, (20010000), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498 | - ALLSHIRE, Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 1818 - 1819 | - VOLPE et al., Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 1833 - 1837 | - JENUWEIN, Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 2215 - 2218 | - HALL et al., Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 2232 - 2237 | - HUTVAGNER; ZAMORE, Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 2056 - 2060 | - MCMANUS et al., RNA, (20020000), vol. 8, pages 842 - 850 | - REINHART et al., Gene & Dev., (20020000), vol. 16, pages 1616 - 1626 | - REINHART; BARTEL, Science, (20020000), vol. 297, page 1831 | - VERDEL et al., Science, (20040000), vol. 303, pages 672 - 676 | - PAL-BHADRA et al., Science, (20040000), vol. 303, pages 669 - 672 | - JANOWSKI et al., Nature Chemical Biology, (20050000), vol. 1, pages 216 - 222 | - MARTINEZ et al., Cell, (20020000), vol. 110, pages 563 - 574 | - SCHWARZ et al., Molecular Cell, (20020000), vol. 10, pages 537 - 568 | - LOAKES, Nucleic Acids Research, (20010000), vol. 29, pages 2437 - 2447 | - ELBASHIR et al., EMBO J., (20010000), vol. 20, pages 6877 - 6888 | - YANG et al., PNAS USA, (20020000), vol. 99, pages 9942 - 9947 | - CALEGARI et al., PNAS USA, (20020000), vol. 99, page 14236 | - BYRON et al., Ambion Tech Notes, (20090000), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 4 - 6 | - KAWASKI et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20030000), vol. 31, pages 981 - 987 | - KNIGHT; BASS, Science, (20010000), vol. 293, pages 2269 - 2271 | - ROBERSTON et al., J. Biol. Chem, vol. 243, no. 82, page 1969 | - CARUTHERS et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19920000), vol. 211, pages 3 - 19 | - WINCOTT, Nucleic Acids Res., (19950000), vol. 23, pages 2677 - 2684 | - WINCOTT et al., Methods Mol. Bio., (19970000), vol. 74, page 59 | - BRENNAN et al., Biotechnol Bioeng., (19980000), vol. 61, pages 33 - 45 | - USMAN et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19870000), vol. 109, page 7845 | - SCARINGE et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, page 5433 | - MOORE et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 256, page 9923 | - SHABAROVA et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19910000), vol. 19, page 4247 | - BELLON et al., Nucleosides & Nucleotides, (19970000), vol. 16, page 951 | - BELLON et al., Bioconjugate Chem., (19970000), vol. 8, page 204 | - AKHTAR et al., "Delivery Strategies for Antisense Oligonucleotide Therapeutics,", Trends Cell Bio., (19920000), vol. 2, page 139 | - MAURER et al., Mol. Membr. Biol., (19990000), vol. 16, pages 129 - 140 | - HOFLAND; HUANG, Handb. Exp. Pharmacol., (19990000), vol. 137, pages 165 - 192 | - LEE et al., ACS Symp. Ser., (20000000), vol. 752, pages 184 - 192 | - GONZALEZ, Bioconjugate Chem.,, (19990000), vol. 10, pages 1068 - 1074 | - COUTURE et al., TIG.,, (19960000), vol. 12, page 510 | - GenBank, Database accession no. D11168, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. D50483.1, URL: ncbi | - "GENBANK", GenBank, Database accession no. L38318, URL: ^ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. S82227, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. AF100308.1, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. U51188, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. X60667, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. NC_001563, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. NC 001347, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. NC 001781, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. AF037412, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. D00239, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. X02316, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. X01087, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. L24917, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. M16248, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. K02121, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. NC_001353, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. NC_001345, URL: ncbi | - GenBank, Database accession no. AJ430458, URL: ncbi | - MILLER, T.A. et al., J. Med. Chem., (20030000), vol. 46, no. 24, pages 5097 - 5116 | - YALPAN, "Cholesterol Lowering Drugs", Chemistry & Industry, (19960205), pages 85 - 89 | - European J. of Cancer, (19990000), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 1394 - 1401 | - PNAS, (19920000), vol. 89, page 7384 | - JNCI, (19820000), vol. 69, page 475 | - Arch. Opthalmol., (19900000), vol. 108, page 573 | - Anat. Rec., (19940000), vol. 238, page 68 | - FEBS Letters, (19950000), vol. 372, page 83 | - CUn, Orthop., (19950000), vol. 313, page 76 | - J. Mol. Endocrinol., (19960000), vol. 16, page 107 | - Jpn. J. Pharmacol., (19970000), vol. 75, page 105 | - Cancer Res., (19970000), vol. 57, page 1625 | - Cell, (19980000), vol. 93, page 705 | - Intl. J. Mol. Med.,, (19980000), vol. 2, page 715 | - J BioI. Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, page 9116 | - FERNANDEZ et al., J. Lab. Clin. Med., (19850000), vol. 105, pages 141 - 145 | - Nature Biotechnology, (19991000), vol. 17, pages 963 - 968 | - KIM et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 362, pages 841 - 844 | - Clin. Chem. La. Med., (20000000), vol. 38, pages 679 - 692 | - Thromb. Haemost., (19980000), vol. 80, pages 10 - 23 | - Thrombosis Res., (20010000), vol. 101, pages 329 - 354 | - BUME-JENSEN; HUNTER, Nature, (20010000), vol. 411, pages 355 - 365 | - J. Cardiovasc. Pharmacol., (19980000), vol. 31, pages 909 - 913 | - J. Bioi. Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, pages 9116 - 9121 | - Invest. Ophthalmol Vis. Set., (20000000), vol. 41, pages 2309 - 2317 | - Arch. Ophthamol., (20010000), vol. 119, pages 709 - 717 | - HALL et al., Am J Hum Genet, (19970000), vol. 61, pages 785 - 789 | - KUFE et al., Cancer Medicine, BC Decker, (20000000), pages 876 - 889 | - "Adenovirus-Mediated Delivery of a uPA/uPAR Antagonist Suppresses Angiogenesis-Dependent Tumor Growth and Dissemination in Mice", Gene Therapy, (19980800), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 1105 - 1113 | - J Immunol, (20000000), vol. 164, pages 217 - 222 | - CONROY et al., Clin. Cancer Res., (19990000), vol. 5, page 2330 | - CULVER, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, MaryAnn Liebert, Inc., (19940000), pages 70 - 71 | - WEN et al., World J Gastroenterol., (20040000), vol. 10, pages 244 - 249 | - MURAO et al., Pharm Res., (20020000), vol. 19, pages 1808 - 1814 | - LIU et al., gene Ther., (20030000), vol. 10, pages 180 - 187 | - HONG et al., J Pharm Pharmacol., (20030000), vol. 54, pages 51 - 58 | - HERRMANN et al., Arch Virol., (20040000), vol. 149, pages 1611 - 1617 | - MATSUNO et al., gene Ther.,, (20030000), vol. 10, pages 1559 - 1566 | - HARTMANN et al., J. Phamacol. Exp. Ther., (19980000), vol. 285, no. 2, pages 920 - 928 | - KRONENWETT et al., Blood, (19980000), vol. 91, no. 3, pages 852 - 862 | - FILION; PHILLIPS, Biochim. Biophys. Acta., (19970000), vol. 1329, no. 2, pages 345 - 356 | - MA AND; WEI, Leuk. Res., (19960000), vol. 20, no. 11/12, pages 925 - 930 | - BONGARTZ et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19940000), vol. 22, no. 22, pages 4681 - 4688 | - BRAND, Curr. Opin. Mol. Ther., (20010000), vol. 3, pages 244 - 248 | - REGNIER et al., J. Drug Target, (19980000), vol. 5, pages 275 - 289 | - KANIKKANNAN, BioDrugs, (20020000), vol. 16, pages 339 - 347 | - WRAIGHT et al., Pharmacol. Ther., (20010000), vol. 90, pages 89 - 104 | - PREAT; DUJARDIN, STP PharmaSciences, (20010000), vol. 11, pages 57 - 68 | - BRIGHAM et al., Am. J. Sci., (19890000), vol. 298, page 278 | - Nature Biotechnology, (20100000), vol. 28, pages 172 - 176 | - JUDGE; MACLACHLAN, Hum Gene Ther, (20080000), vol. 19, pages 111 - 124 | - JUDGE et al., Mol Ther, (20060000), vol. 13, pages 494 - 505 | - EBERLE et al., J Immunol, (20080000), vol. 180, pages 3229 - 3237 | - SIOUD et al., Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20070000), vol. 361, pages 122 - 126 | - ROBBINS et al., Mol Ther, (20070000), vol. 15, pages 1663 - 1669 | - SHIN et al., Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20070000), vol. 364, pages 436 - 442 | - CEKAITE et al., J Mol Biol, (20070000), vol. 365, pages 90 - 108 | - PEACOCK et al., J Am Chem Soc, (20110000), vol. 133, pages 9200 - 9203 | - JUDGE et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20050000), vol. 23, pages 457 - 462 | - ABRAMS et al., Mol. Ther, (20100000), vol. 18, pages 171 - 180 | - JUDGE et al., Mol. Ther., (20060000), vol. 13, pages 494 - 505 | - JUDGEET, Nat Biotechnol, (20050000), vol. 23, pages 457 - 462 | - SIOUD et al., Biochem Biophys Res Commun, vol. 361, pages 122 - 126 | US20110707909 | US20000235708 | US20000244697 | US20010782856 | US20020190359 | US20020201394 | US20030427160 | US20040923536 | US20040957251 | US20040981966 | US20060064014 | US20080064014 | WO2009US53336 | US20090235476 | US20090249807 | US20090640342 | WO2010US20013 | US20100315223 | US20100322054 | US20100322422 | US20100347640 | US20100351373 | US20100378609 | US20100382067 | US20100384486 | US20100388201 | WO2011US52328 |