EP3324605 - TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/39] |
Former [2018/21] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL, 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Eunkyung IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yoon, Sunghye IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Jang, Hyungtae IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 04 /
JOO, Goeun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 05 /
Choi, Yoojin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17001770.1 | 26.10.2017 | [2018/21] | Priority number, date | KR20160153125 | 17.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160153125 | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3324605 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3324605 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, G06F3/0488 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72469 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/451 (US);
G06F3/04817 (KR,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/0484 (CN,KR);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
G06F3/04855 (US);
G06F3/0486 (US);
G06F3/0487 (US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72403 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/7243 (CN);
H04M1/72454 (CN);
H04M1/72472 (CN);
H04M1/72484 (CN);
G06F2203/04803 (KR);
H04M2201/34 (KR);
H04M2201/38 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON | [2018/21] | English: | TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | [2018/21] | French: | TERMINAL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2018/21] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 23.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2017 | AL | 23.09.2020 | AT | 23.09.2020 | CY | 23.09.2020 | CZ | 23.09.2020 | DK | 23.09.2020 | EE | 23.09.2020 | ES | 23.09.2020 | FI | 23.09.2020 | HR | 23.09.2020 | IT | 23.09.2020 | LT | 23.09.2020 | LV | 23.09.2020 | MC | 23.09.2020 | MK | 23.09.2020 | MT | 23.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | PL | 23.09.2020 | RO | 23.09.2020 | RS | 23.09.2020 | SE | 23.09.2020 | SI | 23.09.2020 | SK | 23.09.2020 | SM | 23.09.2020 | TR | 23.09.2020 | IE | 26.10.2020 | LU | 26.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | FR | 23.11.2020 | BG | 23.12.2020 | NO | 23.12.2020 | GR | 24.12.2020 | IS | 23.01.2021 | PT | 25.01.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 26.10.2017 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
MK | 23.09.2020 | ||
MT | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
TR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IE | 26.10.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.10.2017 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
MT | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
TR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IE | 26.10.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
IE | 26.10.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 23.11.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
IE | 26.10.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
NO | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008320391 (LEMAY STEPHEN O [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,12,13 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0156] * * figures 1A, 5A * [I] 3,6,7,11,14,15; | [XI]US2009178007 (MATAS MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,12,13 * paragraph [0163] - paragraph [0177] * * figures 5C-5J * [I] 3,6,7,11,14,15; | [A]US2011119610 (HACKBORN DIANNE K [US], et al) [A] 3,11 * paragraph [0007] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]WO2016104861 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 7,15; | [A]US2016265952 (HWANG SUNGJAE [KR]) [A] 6,14 * paragraph [0170] * * figures 14a - 14e *; | US2017351580 [ ] (KIM MINWOO [KR], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0194] ** figure 6 *; | [A] - Rupesh Sinha, "How to Customize Navigation Bar in Android | Beebom", https://beebom.com, (20160929), pages 1 - 10, URL: https://beebom.com/how-customize-navigation-bar-android/, (20180315), XP055459779 [A] 3,11 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Making the status bar and navigation bar transparent, with a ListView, on Android 4.4 KitKat | The Mind of an Android Dev", (20131228), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://mindofaandroiddev.wordpress.com/2013/12/28/making-the-status-bar-and-navigation-bar-transparent-with-a-listview-on-android-4-4-kitkat/, (20180315), XP055459788 [A] 3,11 * the whole document * |