EP3415956 - EARLY DETECTION OF MAJOR SEISMS USING BROADBAND ACCELEROMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | 01.12.2023 | Request for re-establishment of rights | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CERAGOS Electronics & Nature 23, Chemin Alphonse Daudet 06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cerasani, Luca 23, Chemin Alphonse DAUDET 06800 CAGNES-SUR-MER / FR | [2018/51] | Application number, filing date | 17020255.0 | 18.06.2017 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415956 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
G01V1/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] |
Former [2018/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FRÜHERKENNUNG VON GROSSEN ERDBEBEN MIT BREITBANDIGEM BESCHLEUNIGUNGSMESSER | [2018/51] | English: | EARLY DETECTION OF MAJOR SEISMS USING BROADBAND ACCELEROMETERS | [2018/51] | French: | DÉTECTION PRÉCOCE DE SÉISMES IMPORTANTS AU MOYEN D'ACCÉLÉROMÈTRES À LARGE BANDE | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 19.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2020 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 31.07.2020 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/01] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 16.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.09.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 16.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.09.2019 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 02.03.2020 | Date of receipt | 24.07.2020 | Request procedure closed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.12.2019 | 30.06.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004135698 (WEBB CRAIG [CA], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [[0002]] , [[0007]] , [[0026]] , [[0027]] , [[0035]] - [[0040]] *; | [X]US2013046475 (LIN PEI-YANG [TW], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0040] , [0062] , [0077] *; | [X] - YIH-MIN WU ET AL, "Development of an Earthquake Early Warning System Using Real-Time Strong Motion Signals", SENSORS, (20080101), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.3390/s8010001, pages 1 - 9, XP055419748 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s8010001 | [A] - D. G. LEVCHENKO ET AL, "Experience in seismic signal recording using broadband electrochemical seismic sensors", SEISMIC INSTRUMENTS - SEISMICHESKIE PRIBORY, RU, (20100701), vol. 46, no. 3, doi:10.3103/S0747923910030072, ISSN 0747-9239, pages 250 - 264, XP055419856 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3103/S0747923910030072 |