EP3213778 - CELLS ON A SUPPORT MATRIX FOR TISSUE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vericel Corporation 64 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2023/10] | For all designated states Vericel Corporation 24 Frank Lloyd Wright Dr., Lobby K Ann Arbor, MI 48105-9755 / US | ||
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states Verigen AG Siemensstrasse 5b 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MING, Hao Zheng 2 Kingsland Avenue City Beach, Western Australia 6015 / AU | 02 /
GIANNETTI, Bruno Oberdorf 59 53347 Bonn / DE | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/11] |
Former [2017/36] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17150192.7 | 29.09.2003 | [2017/36] | Priority number, date | US20020414098P | 27.09.2002 Original published format: US 414098 P | [2017/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3213778 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3213778 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3213778 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61P17/00, A61P19/00, A61L27/38, A61K35/12, C12N5/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
A61K35/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/3804 (EP,US);
A61L27/3839 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
C12N5/0068 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | A61L27/38, A61K35/12, C12N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2017/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZELLEN AUF MATRIXUNTERLAGEN FÜR DIE WIEDERHERSTELLUNG VON GEWEBEN | [2017/36] | English: | CELLS ON A SUPPORT MATRIX FOR TISSUE REPAIR | [2017/36] | French: | CELLULES SEMÉES SUR UNE MATRICE DE SUPPORT POUR EFFECTUER DES RÉPARATIONS TISSULAIRES | [2017/36] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03750654.0 / EP1546307 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | GB | 28.09.2023 | IE | 29.09.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
GB | 28.09.2023 | ||
IE | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
GB | 28.09.2023 | ||
IE | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | SE | 15.03.2023 | |
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | SE | 15.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5306311 (STONE KEVIN R [US], et al); | [XY]WO0108610 (VERIGEN TRANSPLANTATION SERV [DE], et al); | Examination | US6120514 | by applicant | US5759190 | US5989269 | US6120514 | US6283980 | US6368298 | US6379367 | US2002173806 | US6569172 | US6592598 | US6592599 | US2003134411 | US6599300 | US2003144197 | US20030427463 |