EP3345917 - ANTIPROTOZOAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bacoba AG Elisabethenstrasse 15 4051 Basel / CH | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agnello, Stefano Türgass 32 8820 Wädenswil / CH | 02 /
Adams, Michael Weiherallee 7 8610 Uster / CH | 03 /
Kaiser, Marcel Hauptstrasse 60 4324 Obermumpf / CH | 04 /
Mäser, Pascal Therwilerstrasse 56 4153 Reinach / CH | 05 /
Urban, Alexander Adamsgasse 13/14 1030 Wien / AT | 06 /
Raguz, Luka Stettemerstrasse 163 8207 Schaffhausen / CH | 07 /
Riedl, Rainer Hungerstrasse 46 8832 Wilen b. Wollerau / CH | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Grellingerstrasse 60 4052 Basel / CH | [2021/46] |
Former [2018/28] | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Austrasse 24 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 17150353.5 | 05.01.2017 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345917 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3345917 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/02 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
C07K7/02 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | 10.01.2019 | Title | German: | ANTIPROTOZOENVERBINDUNG | [2018/28] | English: | ANTIPROTOZOAL COMPOUNDS | [2018/28] | French: | COMPOSÉ ANTIPROTOZOAIRE | [2018/28] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 10.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.03.2021 | 24.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 06.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 06.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.01.2017 | AL | 17.11.2021 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | CZ | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | ES | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | HR | 17.11.2021 | IT | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | LV | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | MK | 17.11.2021 | NL | 17.11.2021 | PL | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | RS | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | SM | 17.11.2021 | TR | 17.11.2021 | IE | 05.01.2022 | LU | 05.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | BG | 17.02.2022 | NO | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.01.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 05.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 05.01.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 05.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.01.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 05.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 05.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 05.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - AKI ISHIYAMA ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo antitrypanosomal activities of three peptide antibiotics: leucinostatin A and B, alamethicin I and tsushimycin", THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, GB, (20090601), vol. 62, no. 6, doi:10.1038/ja.2009.32, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 303 - 308, XP055344637 [X] 1 * Abstract; Fig. 1 * [I] 2-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ja.2009.32 | [XI] - THOMAS DEGENKOLB ET AL, "Formation of New Lipoaminopeptides, Acremostatins A, B, and C, by Co-cultivation of Acremonium sp. Tbp-5 and Mycogone rosea DSM 12973", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY., TOKYO, JAPAN, (20020122), vol. 66, no. 4, doi:10.1271/bbb.66.883, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 883 - 886, XP055344837 [X] 1 * Abstract; Fig. 1 * [I] 2-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.66.883 | [XI] - ANA FLÁVIA CANOVAS MARTINEZ ET AL, "Liquid chromatography-tandem mass spectrometry characterization of five new leucinostatins produced by Paecilomyces lilacinus CG-189", THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, GB, (20150301), vol. 68, no. 3, doi:10.1038/ja.2014.120, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 178 - 184, XP055344838 [X] 1 * Abstract; Table 1. * [I] 2-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ja.2014.120 | [XI] - MICHAELA STACH ET AL, "Improved Strategy for the Synthesis of the Anticancer Agent Culicinin D", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, DE, (20151018), vol. 2015, no. 28, doi:10.1002/ejoc.201500872, ISSN 1434-193X, pages 6341 - 6350, XP055344854 [X] 1 * Abstract; Fig. 1 * [I] 2-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejoc.201500872 | [A] - MARCEL KAISER ET AL, "Antiprotozoal Activity Profiling of Approved Drugs: A Starting Point toward Drug Repositioning", PLOS ONE, (20150813), vol. 10, no. 8, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0135556, page e0135556, XP055344644 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0135556 | [XI] - KAZUHIKO OTOGURO ET AL, "In Vitro Antimalarial Activities of the Microbial Metabolites.", THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, GB, (20030101), vol. 56, no. 3, doi:10.7164/antibiotics.56.322, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 322 - 324, XP055344799 [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7164/antibiotics.56.322 | by applicant | - SUNDAR S ET AL., CLIN. INFECT. DIS., vol. 31, no. 4, pages 1104 - 1107 | - THAKUR CP ET AL., J. MED. RES, vol. 120, no. 3, pages 166 - 172 | - THAKUR CP ET AL., TRANS. R. SOC. TROP. MED. HYG, vol. 93, no. 3, pages 319 - 323 | - THAKUR CP ET AL., TRANS. R. SOC. TROP. MED. HYG., vol. 90, no. 3, pages 319 - 322 | - SUNDAR S ET AL., CLIN. INFECT. DIS., vol. 42, no. 5, pages 608 - 613 | - VERTUANI ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1995), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 254 - 260 | - ISOGAI ET AL., BIOSCI. BIOTECH BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 56, no. 7, pages 1079 - 1085 | - OTOGORO ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (2003), vol. 3, pages 322 - 324 | - ISHIYAMA ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (2009), vol. 62, page 343 | - KHARE ET AL., NATURE, (2016), vol. 537, pages 229 - 233 | - K. KATSUNO ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS, (2015), vol. 14, pages 751 - 758 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1991), vol. 32, pages 3985 - 3988 | - RAZ B ET AL., ACTA TROPICA, (1997), vol. 68, pages 139 - 147 | - BUCKNER FS ET AL., ANTIMICROB AGENTS CH1996, vol. 40, pages 2592 - 2597 | - BALTZ T ET AL., EMBO J, (1985), vol. 4, pages 1273 - 1277 | - TRAGER W.; JENSEN, J.B, SCIENCE, (1976), vol. 193, pages 673 - 675 | - YARDLEY V.; CROFT SL, INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS, (2000), vol. 13, pages 243 - 248 |