EP3174292 - APPARATUS FOR DECODING VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/48] |
Former [2017/22] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Jung-Hye 1004-704 BangJuk Maeul Yeongtong Tranchae Apt. Mangpo-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon si 443-745 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
HAN, Woo-Jin 102-1104 Acropark Apt. 296-6 Woncheon-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 443-774 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
KIM, Il-Koo 109-1903 GS Xi Apt. Cheongho-dong, Osan-si 447-756 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2017/22] | Application number, filing date | 17150679.3 | 17.08.2010 | [2017/22] | Priority number, date | KR20090075855 | 17.08.2009 Original published format: KR 20090075855 | [2017/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3174292 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/176, H04N19/96, H04N19/593, H04N19/11, H04N19/117, H04N19/182, H04N19/82 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
H04N19/11 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/105 (RU,US);
H04N19/51 (KR);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/115 (US);
H04N19/117 (EP,BR,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/137 (KR);
H04N19/176 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,BR,RU,US);
H04N19/44 (RU,US);
H04N19/50 (US);
H04N19/593 (EP,BR,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] |
Former [2017/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DECODIERUNG VON VIDEO | [2017/22] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DECODING VIDEO | [2017/22] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO | [2017/22] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 09.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10810147.8 / EP2454883 | Divisional application(s) | EP18199130.8 / EP3448030 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003202602 (APOSTOLOPOULOS JOHN G [US], et al); | [A]US2004136458 (DAHLHOFF ACHIM [DE], et al); |