EP3193120 - HEAT EXCHANGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2022 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BORGWARNER EMISSIONS SYSTEMS SPAIN, S.L.U. Carretera de Zamanes, 20 36315 Vigo Pontevedra / ES | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMIDA DOMÍNGUEZ, Xoan Xosé Urb. San Benito 18 E-36380 Gondomar-Pontevedra / ES | 02 /
NOVO, Javier Irmáns Sarabia, 22, 2ºB E-36209 Vigo / ES | 03 /
LORENZO GONZÁLEZ, Manuel Levada, 25, Mosende E-36413 Porriño / ES | 04 /
VARGAS, Alejandro Alexandre Bóveda, N2, P2 E-36210 Vigo / ES | 05 /
CARRERA GARCÍA, Julio Abraham Aragón, 82, 3ºE E-36206 Vigo / ES | [2017/32] |
Former [2017/29] | 01 /
HERMIDA DOMÍNGUEZ, Xoan Xosé Urb. San Benito 18 E-36380 Gondomar-Pontevedra / ES | ||
02 /
NOVO, Javier Irmáns Sarabia, 22, 2ºB E-36209 Vigo / ES | |||
03 /
LORENZO GONZÁLEZ, Manuel Levada, 25, Mosende E-36413 Porriño / ES | |||
04 /
VARGAS, Alejandro Alexandre Bóveda, N2, P2 E-36210 Vigo / ES | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17150970.6 | 11.01.2017 | [2017/29] | Priority number, date | EP20160382013 | 14.01.2016 Original published format: EP 16382013 | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193120 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, F28F9/00, F28F9/22, F02M26/30, F28D7/06, F28D9/00, F02B29/04, F02M26/32, F28F1/02, F28F1/04 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
F28F9/001 (EP,US);
F02M26/32 (EP,KR,US);
F28D21/0003 (US);
F02M26/28 (KR);
F02M26/30 (EP,US);
F28D1/03 (KR);
F28D7/0066 (US);
F28D7/06 (EP,US);
F28D9/0037 (EP,US);
F28F1/025 (EP,US);
F28F1/04 (EP,US);
F28F9/002 (EP,US);
F28F9/02 (US);
F28F9/0265 (EP,US);
F28F9/22 (EP,US);
F28D2021/008 (KR);
F28F2009/226 (EP,US);
F28F2250/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/29] | F28F1/02, F28F9/00, F28F9/22, F02M26/30, F28D7/06, F28D9/00, F02B29/04, F02M26/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2017/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHERVORRICHTUNG | [2017/29] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGE DEVICE | [2017/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANGE DE CHALEUR | [2017/29] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/14] | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007023174 (BROST VIKTOR [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2009114924 (TOKYO RADIATOR SEIZO KK) [Y] 1-16 * figure 3 *; | [X]US2009260787 (KALBACHER KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2012132614 (YUTAKA GIKEN CO LTD) [Y] 5,8,11 * figure 9 *; | [Y]JP2014194296 (USUI KOKUSAI SANGYO KK) [Y] 5* figure 1 *; | [Y]KR20150067667 (HALLA VISTEON CLIMATE CONTROL [KR]) [Y] 1-16 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2015316330 (KENNEY BENJAMIN A [CA], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |