EP3349210 - ACTIVE NOISE REDUCTION APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpine Electronics, Inc. 1-1-8 Nishi-Gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moldenhauer, Ingo c/o ALPINE ELECTRONICS R&D EUROPE GMBH Vor dem Lauch 14 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17151137.1 | 12.01.2017 | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3349210 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/178 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
G10K11/178 (EP);
G10K2210/12821 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVE RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2018/29] | English: | ACTIVE NOISE REDUCTION APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A VEHICLE | [2018/29] | French: | APPAREIL DE RÉDUCTION ACTIVE DE BRUIT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2018/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/30] | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19900782 (UFERMANN RUEDIGER [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-14 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * column 1, line 32 - line 50 * [Y] 4,5,10; | [X]DE20000581U (GAUERMANN JOERG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,11-14 * abstract * * figure 1 * * point 2, l. 4, 7 * * point 3, l. 2 *; | [XY]US5598479 (DODT THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,9,11-13 * abstract * * figures 2, 9, 10 * * column 3, line 1 - line 3 * * column 3, line 66 - line 67 * * column 6, line 50 - line 53 * * column 9, line 35 - line 36 * * column 9, line 47 - line 52 * * column 9, line 58 - line 61 * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US2012230504 (KURODA KAZUO [JP]) [Y] 10 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0045] * | by applicant | JP2005234203 | US8706351 | JP2003216163 | JP2011168151 |