EP3349185 - METHOD FOR PERFORMING A FUNCTION TEST FOR AT LEAST ONE DOOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states dormakaba Deutschland GmbH Dorma Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WULBRANDT, Tim Dorma Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 02 /
WEGNER, Frank Dorma Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 17151289.0 | 12.01.2017 | [2018/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3349185 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G07C3/00, G07C9/00, H04Q9/00 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
G07C3/00 (EP);
G07C9/00174 (EP);
G07C2009/00769 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2018/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER FUNKTIONSPRÜFUNG BEI WENIGSTENS EINEM TÜRSYSTEM | [2018/29] | English: | METHOD FOR PERFORMING A FUNCTION TEST FOR AT LEAST ONE DOOR SYSTEM | [2018/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXÉCUTION D'UN CONTRÔLE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'AU MOINS UN SYSTÈME DE PORTE | [2018/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 17.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004003257 (MITCHELL ERNST KERN [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0030] *; | [I]US2013318519 (COOLIDGE FRANK L [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0010] - [0056] *; | [XI]US2016148451 (MENKVELD JUSTIN [US]) [X] 1-3,6,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0034] * [I] 4,5,7-11; | [I]US2016364927 (BARRY PATRICK J [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0130] * |