EP3192366 - SYSTEM FOR RELEASING BENEFICIAL MITES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koppert B.V. Veilingweg 14 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROOT, Thomas Volkert Marie Veilingweg 14 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | 02 /
OUDE LENFERINK, Kirsten Eva Elisabeth Veilingweg 14 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | 03 /
VAN HOUTEN, Yvonne Maria Veilingweg 14 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | 04 /
VAN BAAL, Adelmar Emmanuel Veilingweg 14 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | 05 /
HOOGERBRUGGE, Hans Veilingweg 14 2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2017/29] | Application number, filing date | 17151679.2 | 16.01.2017 | [2017/29] | Priority number, date | NL20162016103 | 15.01.2016 Original published format: NL 2016103 | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3192366 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3192366 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/033, A01N63/00, A01G13/00, B32B15/00 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
A01K67/033 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B32B15/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01G7/00 (US);
A01N63/00 (IL,KR);
A01N63/16 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B3/266 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/04 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2227/706 (KR,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/205 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/31 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/41 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/42 (KR);
B32B2307/7242 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2017/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | 26.10.2017 | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ABGABE VON VORTEILHAFTEN MILBEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/29] | English: | SYSTEM FOR RELEASING BENEFICIAL MITES AND USES THEREOF | [2017/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LIBÉRATION D'ACARIENS UTILES ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2017/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17206420.6 / EP3372074 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | RS | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | AL | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | HR | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | HR | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | LT | 13.12.2017 | |
NO | 13.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2393890 (SYNGENTA BIOLINE LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-11 * page 6, paragraphs 2,3 *; | [A]US2005178337 (WRIGHT IRVINE W [GB]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0014] , [0039] - [0041] *; | [A]CN201444826U (PLANT PROT RES INST GUANGDONG ACADEMY AGRICULTURAL SCIENCES) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [AD]WO2010079353 (CERTIS EUROP BV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-11 * page 2, lines 13-22 * * page 5, lines 1-9 * * page 6, lines 8-10; claims 1,8,16,22,23 * | by applicant | GB2393890 | EP1686849 | EP1830631 | EP1965634 | EP2042036 | EP2405741 | WO2013103295 | WO2013103294 | GB2509224 | EP2612551 | - BAKER A.S.; OSTOJA-STARZEWSKI J.C, "New distributional records of the mite Parasitus mycophilus (Acari: Mesostigmata), with a redescription of the male and first description of the deutonymph", SYSTEMATIC & APPLIED ACAROLOGY, (2002), vol. 7, pages 113 - 122 | - CUTHBERTSON A.G.S.; QIU B.-L.; MURCHIE A.K., "Anystis baccarum: An Important Generalist Predatory Mite to be Considered in Apple Orchard Pest Management Strategies", INSECTS, (2014), vol. 5, pages 615 - 628 | - "The mites of stored food and houses", HUGHES, A.M., Technical Bulletin No. 9, MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE, FISHERIES AND FOOD, (1977), page 400 | - SOLOMON, M.E.; CUNNINGTON, A.M., Rearing acaroidmites, AGRICULTURAL RESEARCH COUNCIL, PEST INFESTATION LABORATORY, SLOUGH, (1963), pages 399 - 403 | - "Guidelines for quality control of commercially produced natural enemies", VAN LENTEREN, J.C.; HALE, A.; KLAPWIJK, J.N.; VAN SCHELT, J; S. STEINBERG, Quality control and production of biological control agents: Theory and testing procedures, CABI PUBLISHING, (2003), pages 293 - 294 |