EP3193080 - END CAP STRUCTURE OF LAMP TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lextar Electronics Corp. No. 3, Gongye E. 3rd Rd. Hsinchu Science Park 30075 Hsinchu / TW | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Tsu-Hsuan 1F., No.24, Ln. 99, Zili Rd., Zhonghe Dist. 235 New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Yang, Ho-Shun No.24, Ln. 761, Zhonghua Rd., Zhubei City 302 Hsinchu County / TW | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2017/29] | Application number, filing date | 17151797.2 | 17.01.2017 | [2017/29] | Priority number, date | TW20160101405 | 18.01.2016 Original published format: TW 105101405 | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193080 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F21V25/04, F21K9/272, F21V23/04, F21V23/06, F21V25/00, H01R13/70, H01R33/96, // F21Y115/10, F21Y103/10 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
F21K9/272 (EP);
F21V23/04 (EP);
F21V23/06 (EP);
F21V25/00 (EP);
F21V25/04 (EP);
F21Y2103/10 (EP);
H01R33/96 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDKAPPE FÜR EINE LEUCHTRÖHRE | [2017/29] | English: | END CAP STRUCTURE OF LAMP TUBE | [2017/29] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CAPUCHON D'EXTRÉMITÉ POUR TUBE LUMINEUX | [2017/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 26.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014003054 (SIMON DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0080]; figures 11A-13 * [I] 12-14; | [XI]WO2015069101 (SILICON HILL BV [NL]) [X] 1-4,10-12 * page 19, line 25 - page 30, line 28; figures 12-26 * [I] 13,14; | [XI]WO2012131522 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 12-14; | [XI]US2013127327 (HEIL VOLKER [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,13 * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0123]; figures 7A-7B * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0131]; figures 9A-9C * [I] 12,14; | [XP]WO2016113011 (OSRAM GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-9 * the whole document * |