EP3352416 - NETWORK INVENTORY CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eggert, Markus Königsberger Weg 85 53773 Hennef / DE | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | RDL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Senefelderstrasse 26 70176 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/30] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17152197.4 | 19.01.2017 | [2018/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3352416 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3352416 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
H04L41/085 (EP);
H04L41/0873 (EP);
H04L41/0853 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Title | German: | NETZWERKINVENTARISIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/30] | English: | NETWORK INVENTORY CONTROL SYSTEM | [2018/30] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INVENTAIRE DE RÉSEAU | [2018/30] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 19.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2017 | AL | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | ES | 15.05.2019 | FI | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | IT | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | NL | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | IE | 19.01.2020 | LU | 19.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/31] | HU | 19.01.2017 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MK | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
IE | 19.01.2020 | ||
LU | 19.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2022/30] | HU | 19.01.2017 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
IE | 19.01.2020 | ||
LU | 19.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 19.01.2017 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
IE | 19.01.2020 | ||
LU | 19.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
IE | 19.01.2020 | ||
LU | 19.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007088630 (MACLEOD STEWART P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0122] * * claim 1 * * figures 1, 4-22 *; | [I]EP2869495 (SOLARWINDS WORLDWIDE LLC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0047] * * claims 1, 7, 14 * * figures 1-4, 6 *; | [A]EP3059929 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0157] * * paragraph [0168] * * claims 1, 5, 8, 12, 15 ** figures 1-2 * |